Dr. med. Claude Cao
domiciled in Hettlingen, from Oberuzwil Active mandates: medyoo AG Connected persons: Andreas Lucas Serra You can stay up to date through "Dr. med. Claude Cao", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dr. med. Claude Cao"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Dr. med. Claude Cao", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dr. med. Claude Cao"
|
Places where people with the name Claude Cao live
Sectors in which people with the name Claude Cao work
Services regarding management consulting
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Claude Cao
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Claude Cao
Publication number: 2651043, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
trustmed GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-110.177.066, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 137 vom 20.07.2015, Publ. 2278055).
Statutenänderung:
28.01.2016.
Sitz neu:
Stäfa.
Domizil neu:
c/o Paul Kaiser, Kreuzstrasse 71e, 8712 Stäfa.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail an die im Anteilbuch verzeichnete Adresse.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Cao, Claude, von Oberuzwil, in Hettlingen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bagattini, Michael, von Weiningen ZH, in Oetwil am See, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Zürich].
Publication number: 2278055, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
trustmed GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-110.177.066, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 23.07.2012, Publ. 6781502).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Cramer, Marcus, von Zürich und finnischer Staatsangehöriger, in Küsnacht ZH, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wälti, Dr. Jörg Walter, von Zürich und Trub, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Burkhardt, Dr. med. Tobias, von Zürich und Horgen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Cao, Claude, von Oberuzwil, in Hettlingen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
BDO AG (CHE-105.952.747)[CH-020.3.927.906-5], in Zürich, Revisionsstelle [bisher: BDO AG (CH-020.3.927.906-5)].
Publication number: 6620880, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Roche Pharma (Schweiz) AG, in Reinach BL, CH-280.3.918.365-6, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 60 vom 26.03.2012, S. 0, Publ. 6609658).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Cao, Dr. Claude, von Oberuzwil, in Reinach BL, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.