Daniele Canadea
domiciled in Bülach, from Appenzell Active mandates: CCT Elektro AG Connected persons: Marco Verderosa, Michael Rainer Kloter You can stay up to date through "Daniele Canadea", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Daniele Canadea"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Daniele Canadea", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Daniele Canadea"
|
Places where people with the name Daniele Canadea live
Sectors in which people with the name Daniele Canadea work
Other construction
Other construction
Private persons with the name Daniele Canadea
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Daniele Canadea
Publication number: HR02-1004815473, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Soltastic AG, in Bülach, CHE-134.044.912, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 182 vom 20.09.2019, Publ. 1004720099).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Canadea, Daniele, von Appenzell, in Bülach, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sperandio, Mauro, von Buchs (ZH), in Winkel, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004720099, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
CCT Solar AG, in Opfikon, CHE-134.044.912, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 17.12.2015, S.0, Publ. 2545669).
Statutenänderung:
13.08.2019.
Firma neu:
Soltastic AG.
Sitz neu:
Bülach.
Domizil neu:
Bahnhofstrasse 44, 8180 Bülach.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Quaranta, Marco, von Höri, in Stadel, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Canadea, Daniele, von Appenzell, in Bülach, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Sperandio, Mauro, von Buchs (ZH), in Winkel, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4169453, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
CCT Elektro AG, in Opfikon, CHE-108.537.652, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 63 vom 03.04.2018, Publ. 4145075).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Carrera, Mario, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bülach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Canadea, Daniele, von Appenzell, in Bülach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Revision und Treuhand Robert Schumacher (CHE-113.974.691), in Männedorf, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Revision und Treuhand Robert Schumacher, in Meilen].