Marc-Antoine Hervé Burgener
domiciled in Rivaz, from Visp Active mandates: Lynell Switzerland SA, Pharmacie du Mont SA and more Connected persons: Manon von Graffenried, Pauline Burgener, Patrick Burgener and more You can stay up to date through "Marc-Antoine Hervé Burgener", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marc-Antoine Hervé Burgener"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Marc-Antoine Hervé Burgener", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marc-Antoine Hervé Burgener"
|
Places where people with the name Marc-Antoine Hervé Burgener live
Sectors in which people with the name Marc-Antoine Hervé Burgener work
Trading with various goods
Drugstore
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Trade fair, exhibition and convention organising
Trading in IT and communications products
Other services in education
Production of clothing
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of restaurants
Trading with various goods
Drugstore
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Trade fair, exhibition and convention organising
Trading in IT and communications products
Other services in education
Production of clothing
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of restaurants
Private persons with the name Marc-Antoine Hervé Burgener
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Marc-Antoine Hervé Burgener
Publication number: HR02-1005770999, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
WABS Entertainment Sàrl, à Crans-Montana, CHE-234.207.735, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 250 du 23.12.2022, Publ. 1005637955).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Burgener, Marc-Antoine, de Visp, à Rivaz, gérant, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005655659, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
WABS Sàrl, à Crans-Montana, CHE-309.552.098, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 30 du 13.02.2020, Publ. 1004829951).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Burgener, Patrick, de Visp, à Morrens (VD), associé, sans droit de signature, pour 66 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
BRGNR Holding SA (CHE-294.781.831), à Lausanne, associée, pour 133 parts sociales de CHF 100.00;
Burgener, Marc-Antoine Hervé, de Visp, à Lausanne, président des gérants, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: associé et président des gérants, avec signature individuelle, pour 67 parts sociales de CHF 100.00].
Publication number: HR02-1004829951, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Rectification de l'inscription au registre journalier no 455 du 03.02.2020, publiée dans la FOSC no 25 du 06.02.2020 . WABS Sàrl, à Crans-Montana, CHE-309.552.098, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 25 du 06.02.2020, Publ. 1004824434).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Burgener, Marc-Antoine Hervé, de Visp, à Lausanne, associé et président des gérants, avec signature individuelle, pour 67 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [non: associé et président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux];
Claret, Etienne, de Troistorrents, à Troistorrents, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 67 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [non: associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux].