Urs Bürgin
domiciled in Itingen, from Bubendorf Active mandates: triangles sarl Connected persons: Thileepan Thuraisamy You can stay up to date through "Urs Bürgin", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Bürgin"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Urs Bürgin", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Bürgin"
|
|
Urs Bürgin
domiciled in Wyssachen, from Villmergen Active mandates: BHA Lift GmbH Connected persons: Maria Bürgin-Huber You can stay up to date through "Urs Bürgin", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Bürgin"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Urs Bürgin", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Bürgin"
|
|
Urs Bürgin
domiciled in Langenthal, from Känerkinden Active mandates: Urs Bürgin Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Urs Bürgin", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Bürgin"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Urs Bürgin", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Bürgin"
|
Places where people with the name Urs Bürgin live
Sectors in which people with the name Urs Bürgin work
Travel agency and tour operator services
Architectural and engineering activities
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Travel agency and tour operator services
Architectural and engineering activities
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Private persons with the name Urs Bürgin
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Urs Bürgin
Publication number: HR02-1006068306, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
JKP Consulting AG, in Zürich, CHE-182.494.057, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 237 vom 06.12.2023, Publ. 1005901988).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bürgin, Urs, von Zürich, in Wetzikon (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005901988, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
JKP Consulting AG, bisher in Zug, CHE-182.494.057, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 89 vom 09.05.2019, Publ. 1004626338).
Statutenänderung:
23.11.2023.
Sitz neu:
Zürich.
Domizil neu:
Riesbachstrasse 57, 8008 Zürich.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung im Bereich Erwerb, Überbauung, Verwaltung und Verkauf von Immobilien und den Handel mit Liegenschaften aller Art im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Sicherheiten für Verbindlichkeiten Dritter und verbundener Gesellschaften abgeben.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Junas, Toni, von Zug, in Unterägeri, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bürgin, Urs, von Zürich, in Wetzikon (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005773619, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Gyros AG in Liquidation, in Zürich, CHE-100.700.575, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 33 vom 16.02.2022, Publ. 1005406532).
Domizil neu:
c/o Urs Bürgin, ZL ZurichLawyers, Riesbachstrasse 57, 8008 Zürich.
Weitere Adressen:
Postfach, 8034 Zürich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Suhr, Dr. Reto, von Wädenswil, in Männedorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bürgin, Urs, von Zürich, in Wetzikon (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Krautter, Matthias, von Eppenberg-Wöschnau, in Maur, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.