Peter Buchmüller
domiciled in Cham, from Dübendorf Active mandates: Tramonti AG Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Peter Buchmüller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter Buchmüller"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Peter Buchmüller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter Buchmüller"
|
Places where people with the name Peter Buchmüller live
Sectors in which people with the name Peter Buchmüller work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Peter Buchmüller
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Peter Buchmüller
Publication number: 2385409, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Trans-Splitt AG, in Basel, CHE-107.735.474, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 15.02.2013, Publ. 7066398).
Domizil neu:
Henric Petri-Str. 6, 4051 Basel. Mit Erklärung vom 27.08.2015 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Buchmüller, Peter, von Basel, in Strengelbach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wirtschafts-Testat AG, in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lohs, Carsten, von Basel, in Oberwil BL, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 1180566, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Trans-Splitt AG, in Basel, Transporte usw., Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 44 vom 05.03.2002, S. 5, Publ. 368898).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Buchmüller, Peter, von Basel, in Strengelbach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Basel].
Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Birkart Transport AG, in M u t t e n z, Betrieb eines Transport- und eines internationalen Speditionsunternehmens, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 20. 01.1998, S. 417).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Buchmüller, Peter, von Basel, in Basel, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eugster, Beat, von Basel, in Küttigen, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Stellvertretender Direktor].