Iwan Bucher
domiciled in Kerns, from Kerns Active mandates: Fitness & Physiotherapie Titlis AG Connected persons: Thea Ursula Bucher You can stay up to date through "Iwan Bucher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Iwan Bucher"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Iwan Bucher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Iwan Bucher"
|
|
Iwan Bucher
domiciled in Lohn-Ammannsegg, from Schüpfen Active mandates: Anzeigerverband Bucheggberg-Wasseramt Connected persons: Markus Jordi, Lyla Khan, Beat Stähli and more You can stay up to date through "Iwan Bucher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Iwan Bucher"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Iwan Bucher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Iwan Bucher"
|
Places where people with the name Iwan Bucher live
Sectors in which people with the name Iwan Bucher work
Sport services
Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)
Sport services
Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)
Private persons with the name Iwan Bucher
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Iwan Bucher
Publication number: HR02-1005437693, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Anzeigerverband Bucheggberg-Wasseramt, in Lüterswil-Gächliwil, CHE-110.021.725, Verein (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 01.07.2019, Publ. 1004663735).
Statutenänderung:
01.09.2021.
Organisation neu:
[Gestrichene Angaben über die Organisation aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 92 HRegV.]. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mühlematter, Beat, von Spiez, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bucher, Iwan, von Schüpfen, in Lohn-Ammannsegg, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005432420, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Fitness & Physiotherapie Titlis AG, in Engelberg, CHE-304.392.290, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 178 vom 14.09.2018, Publ. 1004455634).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Koch, Johan Anthon, niederländischer Staatsangehöriger, in Küssnacht (SZ), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
Pira, Markus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Horw, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bucher, Iwan, von Kerns, in Kerns, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bucher, Thea, von Kerns, in Sarnen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004718492, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Lionfood Lifestyle AG, in Luzern, CHE-472.782.119, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 24.07.2017, Publ. 3661323).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bucher, Iwan, von Kerns, in Kerns, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Narboni, Patric, von Opfikon, in Bitsch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Atac, Salih, von Hergiswil (NW), in Hergiswil (NW), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].