Fritz Brunner
domiciled in Zürich, from Kaltbrunn Active mandates: Gemeinnützige Baugenossenschaft Hirslanden Connected persons: Marco Paniz, Fabian Imwinkelried, Philipp Andreas Merkt and more You can stay up to date through "Fritz Brunner", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Fritz Brunner"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Fritz Brunner", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Fritz Brunner"
|
|
Fritz Brunner
domiciled in Basel, from Zürich Active mandates: Elektro-Kessler AG, Zweigniederlassung Breitenbach Connected persons: Erich Thummel, Willi Sonderegger, Gerold Kessler and more You can stay up to date through "Fritz Brunner", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Fritz Brunner"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Fritz Brunner", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Fritz Brunner"
|
Places where people with the name Fritz Brunner live
Sectors in which people with the name Fritz Brunner work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
BranchCode_n/a
Management of real estate portfolio properties
BranchCode_n/a
Private persons with the name Fritz Brunner
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Fritz Brunner
Publication number: HR02-1004981345, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
AGI Büren NW GmbH, in Oberdorf (NW), CHE-112.045.346, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 01.07.2019, Publ. 1004663584).
Firma neu:
AGI Büren NW GmbH in Liq.. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 11.09.2020 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brunner, Fritz, von Lauterbrunnen, in Thun, Gesellschafter, Direktor, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter, Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004663584, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
AGI Büren NW GmbH, in Oberdorf (NW), CHE-112.045.346, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 07.07.2015, S.0, Publ. 2254075).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Naumann, Jürgen Karl-Ulrich, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Thun, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 180 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fischer, Ernst, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Leutkirch im Allgäu (DE), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 186 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 16 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Brunner, Fritz, von Lauterbrunnen, in Thun, Gesellschafter, Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: 3535729, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
FB Mutual GmbH, in Basel, CHE-109.684.907, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 130 vom 08.07.2010, Publ. 5716966).
Firma neu:
FB Mutual GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 15.05.2017 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brunner, Fritz, von Basel, in Basel, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Brunner, Maria-Theresa, von Basel, in Basel, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift].