Christian Brun
domiciled in Willisau, from Entlebuch Active mandates: Ypsotec AG Connected persons: Samuel Künzli, Christoph Georg Reuter, Roland Jakob Waber and more You can stay up to date through "Christian Brun", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Brun"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Brun", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Brun"
|
|
Christian Brun
domiciled in Ruswil, from Kriens Active mandates: pircher partner KÄLTE & KLIMA AG, pircher partner IMMOBILIEN AG Connected persons: Roman Brun, Lars Wicki, Lars Wicki and more You can stay up to date through "Christian Brun", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Brun"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Brun", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Brun"
|
|
Christian Brun
domiciled in Herznach, from Widen Active mandates: Cyrisian GmbH Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Christian Brun", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Brun"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Brun", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Brun"
|
Places where people with the name Christian Brun live
Sectors in which people with the name Christian Brun work
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Other construction
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Architectural and engineering activities
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Other construction
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Architectural and engineering activities
Private persons with the name Christian Brun
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christian Brun
Publication number: HR02-1005675578, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Cyrisian GmbH, in Bettwil, CHE-239.306.095, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 33 vom 18.02.2020, Publ. 1004833012). [Gemeindefusion vom 01.01.2023].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brun, Christian, von Widen, in Herznach-Ueken, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Herznach].
Publication number: HR02-1005240720, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Bianchi AG, in Chur, CHE-100.892.428, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 139 vom 22.07.2009, S.14, Publ. 5153556).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brun, Christian, von Entlebuch, in Willisau, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bodmer, Stefan, von Grüningen, in Aarau, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
Merz, Hans Jörg, von Beinwil am See, in Solothurn, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Publication number: HR02-1005151613, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Rud. Bürgi + Partner GmbH, in Aarau, CHE-105.495.827, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 162 vom 23.08.2018, Publ. 4431093).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rötheli, Patrick, von Hägendorf, in Aarau, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, ;
Kradolfer, Werner, von Schönholzerswilen, in Hägendorf, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Brun, Christian, von Entlebuch, in Willisau, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Veigl, Alexander, von Wettingen, in Oberwil-Lieli, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schneider, Alexander, genannt Alex, von Nenzlingen, in Oftringen, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Di Cesare, Simona, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Unterengstringen, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Merz, Hans Jörg, von Beinwil am See, in Gretzenbach, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bodmer, Stefan, von Grüningen, in Untersiggenthal, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.