Martin Bischoff
domiciled in Zollikofen, from Thun Active mandates: Garage Bischoff Martin Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Martin Bischoff", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Bischoff"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Martin Bischoff", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Bischoff"
|
|
Martin Bischoff
domiciled in Fahrni b. Thun, from Thun Active mandates: Martin Bischoff Gold- und Platinschmiede AG Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Martin Bischoff", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Bischoff"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Martin Bischoff", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Bischoff"
|
|
Martin Bischoff
domiciled in Thun, from Thun Active mandates: BLS Schifffahrt AG Connected persons: Horst Damian Johner, Henrik Müller, Yvonne Waber and more You can stay up to date through "Martin Bischoff", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Bischoff"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Martin Bischoff", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Bischoff"
|
Places where people with the name Martin Bischoff live
Sectors in which people with the name Martin Bischoff work
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Manufacturing of jewellery and similar products
Passenger and cargo transportation by ship (non-maritime)
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Manufacturing of jewellery and similar products
Passenger and cargo transportation by ship (non-maritime)
Private persons with the name Martin Bischoff
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Martin Bischoff
Publication number: HR02-1005970079, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
QESTIT AG, in Zürich, CHE-205.004.868, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 133 vom 12.07.2022, Publ. 1005518316).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bischoff, Martin, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Mudrinic, Sasko, von Wohlen (AG), in Wohlen (AG), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005681473, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Confideo IT Consulting AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-370.307.528, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 198 vom 12.10.2022, Publ. 1005581618).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bischoff, Martin, von St. Gallen, in Rorschacherberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005603000, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
datenschutzguide.ch GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-498.668.376, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 118 vom 21.06.2022, Publ. 1005500230).
Statutenänderung:
25.10.2022.
Stammkapital neu:
CHF 45'000.00 [bisher: CHF 21'000.00].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bischoff, Martin Kurt, von St. Gallen, in Rorschacherberg, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 133 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 53 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Wissing, Claus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Emsdetten (DE), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 133 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 53 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Ribbers, Frank, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Emsdetten (DE), Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 132 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 52 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].