Roland Bienz
domiciled in Geroldswil, from Luzern Active mandates: Electrolux AG Connected persons: Geza Stanek, Stefano Francesco Saverio Grasso, Marcel Martin and more You can stay up to date through "Roland Bienz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Bienz"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Roland Bienz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Bienz"
|
|
Roland Bienz
domiciled in Schaffhausen, from Stammheim Active mandates: Anliker Auto AG Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Roland Bienz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Bienz"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Roland Bienz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Bienz"
|
|
Roland Bienz
domiciled in Giswil, from Hasle (LU) Active mandates: Garage & Carrosserie Bienz AG Connected persons: Hans Josef Bienz, Thomas Bienz You can stay up to date through "Roland Bienz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Bienz"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Roland Bienz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Bienz"
|
Places where people with the name Roland Bienz live
Sectors in which people with the name Roland Bienz work
Trading in consumer goods
Car dealership
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Trading in consumer goods
Car dealership
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Private persons with the name Roland Bienz
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Roland Bienz
Publication number: HR02-1004915169, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Anliker Auto AG, in Stein am Rhein, CHE-313.433.485, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 89 vom 09.05.2011, S.0, Publ. 6153348).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Anliker-Roost, Manfred, von Gondiswil, in Eschenz, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Unterschlatt (Schlatt (TG)), einziges Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Bienz, Roland, von Stammheim, in Schaffhausen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004574655, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Gastros Switzerland AG, in Zürich, CHE-116.325.974, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 23 vom 04.02.2019, Publ. 1004557172).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bienz, Roland, von Luzern, in Geroldswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Cairoli, Peter, von Thörigen, in Pratteln, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004506369, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Gastros Switzerland AG, in Zürich, CHE-116.325.974, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 118 vom 21.06.2018, Publ. 4304559).
Statutenänderung:
09.11.2018.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 648'053.00 [bisher: CHF 531'386.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 648'053.00 [bisher: CHF 531'386.00].
Aktien neu:
648'053 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00 [bisher: 531'386 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00]. Ordentliche Erhöhung des Aktienkapitals.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bardola, Duri, von Sent, in Weinfelden, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bienz, Roland, von Luzern, in Geroldswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Cairoli, Peter, von Thörigen, in Pratteln, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Briccos, Walter, von Basel, in Olsberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.