Rachel Bichet
domiciled in Saillon, from Le Grand-Saconnex Active mandates: KPS SNC Connected persons: Rachel Ngo Ntomp You can stay up to date through "Rachel Bichet", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rachel Bichet"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Rachel Bichet", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rachel Bichet"
|
Places where people with the name Rachel Bichet live
Sectors in which people with the name Rachel Bichet work
Production of cleaning and cosmetic articles
Production of cleaning and cosmetic articles
Private persons with the name Rachel Bichet
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Rachel Bichet
Publication number: HR02-1005311834, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
KPS SNC, précédemment à Genève, CHE-404.616.679, société en nom collectif (No. FOSC 132 du 11.07.2019, Publ. 1004673871).
Nouveau siège:
Saillon.
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Rachel Ngo Ntomp, Route du Clos d'Avaux 27, 1913 Saillon.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Bichet, Rachel, de Le Grand-Saconnex, à Saillon, associée, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: à Genève];
Ngo Ntomp, Rachel, de Genève, à Saillon, associée, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: à Genève].
Publication number: HR02-1005279477, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Thermalp Les Bains d'Ovronnaz SA, à Leytron, CHE-103.646.251, société anonyme (No. FOSC 20 du 30.01.2020, Publ. 1004818668).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Bichet, Rachel, de Le Grand-Saconnex, à Genève, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004818668, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Thermalp Les Bains d'Ovronnaz SA, à Leytron, CHE-103.646.251, société anonyme (No. FOSC 210 du 30.10.2019, Publ. 1004748594).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Donnet-Descartes, Jean-Daniel, de Monthey, à Saxon, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux];
Bichet, Rachel, de Le Grand-Saconnex, à Genève, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administratrice, avec signature collective à deux avec le président];
Farshidi Nia, Marc, citoyen français, à Genève, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur, avec signature collective à deux avec le président].