Nicolas Henrik Berg
domiciled in Solothurn, from Bern Active mandates: Seprify AG, Verein Zürcher Kammerphilharmonie and more Connected persons: Lukas Schertel, Oliver Polcher, Cornelia Köhnsen and more You can stay up to date through "Nicolas Henrik Berg", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Nicolas Henrik Berg"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Nicolas Henrik Berg", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Nicolas Henrik Berg"
|
Places where people with the name Nicolas Henrik Berg live
Sectors in which people with the name Nicolas Henrik Berg work
Production of chemical products
Creative, artistic and entertainment services
Services regarding management consulting
Production of chemical products
Creative, artistic and entertainment services
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Nicolas Henrik Berg
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Nicolas Henrik Berg
Publication number: HR02-1005464367, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Verein Orchester vom See, in Zürich, CHE-265.873.336, Verein (SHAB Nr. 148 vom 03.08.2020, Publ. 1004950093).
Statutenänderung:
03.03.2022.
Name neu:
Verein Zürcher Kammerphilharmonie.
Zweck neu:
Der Verein ZKP verfolgt weder Erwerbs- noch Selbsthilfezwecke sondern ausschliesslich gemeinnützige Zwecke, insbesondere die Förderung der Zürcher Kammerphilharmonie (vormals Orchester vom See), die Wiederaufführung der Werke des Wädenswiler Musikers Fritz Stüssi (1874 - 1923) sowie die Förderung junger Musiker.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Szucs, Tomas, von Basel, in Zollikon, Mitglied des Vorstandes, Beisitzer, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Berg, Nicolas, von Bern, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Vorstandes, Beisitzer, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005110692, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Cleveron AG, in Stettlen, CHE-198.383.541, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 23.06.2020, Publ. 1004917374).
Domizil neu:
Bernapark 28, 3066 Stettlen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Berg, Nicolas, von Bern, in Solothurn, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Barben, Michael Dieter, von Spiez, in Langenthal, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005060717, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
LiVET AG, in Bern, CHE-271.146.061, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 01.05.2020, Publ. 1004881031).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Berg, Nicolas, von Bern, in Solothurn, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brandt, Derek, von Basel, in Sissach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Oberdorf BL, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].