Christian Badertscher
domiciled in Riggisberg, from Lauperswil Active mandates: U. Badertscher Transport AG Connected persons: Marcel Badertscher, Verena Badertscher You can stay up to date through "Christian Badertscher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Badertscher"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Badertscher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Badertscher"
|
|
Christian Badertscher
domiciled in Kloten, from Zäziwil Active mandates: Zielacker AG Connected persons: Jürg Badertscher You can stay up to date through "Christian Badertscher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Badertscher"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Badertscher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Badertscher"
|
|
Christian Badertscher
domiciled in Montmollin, from Lauperswil Active mandates: Dechibois-Bardertscher Sàrl Connected persons: Yannick Badertscher You can stay up to date through "Christian Badertscher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Badertscher"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Badertscher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Badertscher"
|
Places where people with the name Christian Badertscher live
Sectors in which people with the name Christian Badertscher work
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Sawmill operation
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Sawmill operation
Private persons with the name Christian Badertscher
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christian Badertscher
Publication number: HR02-1006061441, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
P. Badertscher AG, in Kradolf-Schönenberg, CHE-102.880.755, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 166 vom 29.08.2022, Publ. 1005549732).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der Sassalbo GmbH, in Kradolf-Schönenberg (CHE-105.307.417), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 28.05.2024 und Bilanz per 31.12.2023. Aktiven von CHF 61'220.78 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 1'136.05 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da die übernehmende Gesellschaft sämtliche Anteile der übertragenden Gesellschaft hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt. [Anpassung Funktionsbezeichnung von Amtes wegen.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Badertscher, Christian, von Eggiwil, in Kesswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005638366, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Zielacker AG, in Lufingen, CHE-103.004.360, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 91 vom 12.05.2021, Publ. 1005178515).
Domizil neu:
Rebstrasse 14a, 8426 Lufingen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Badertscher, Jürg, von Lufingen und Zäziwil, in Lufingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Badertscher, Christian, von Zäziwil, in Kloten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005496319, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
B&R DIREKT VERTRIEBS GMBH, in Kradolf-Schönenberg, CHE-114.739.589, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 41 vom 02.03.2009, S.15, Publ. 4903968).
Firma neu:
B&R DIREKT VERTRIEBS GMBH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 12.05.2022 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Badertscher, Christian, von Eggiwil, in Kesswil, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rösner, Peter, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wertheim-Nassig (DE), Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 15 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
OBT AG (CHE-109.029.855), in St. Gallen, Liquidatorin.