Françoise Anzévui
domiciled in Sion, from Evolène Active mandates: AF Immobilier SA, A Plus Printing Sàrl and more Connected persons: Bruno Bosschaert, Dirk Stans, Luc Smets You can stay up to date through "Françoise Anzévui", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Françoise Anzévui"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Françoise Anzévui", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Françoise Anzévui"
|
Places where people with the name Françoise Anzévui live
Sectors in which people with the name Françoise Anzévui work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of a printing plant and/or bindery
Trading with machines
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of a printing plant and/or bindery
Trading with machines
Private persons with the name Françoise Anzévui
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Françoise Anzévui
Publication number: HR02-1005633693, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
AF-Conseils Sàrl, à Sion, CHE-112.322.273, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 182 du 18.09.2020, Publ. 1004981831).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Anzévui, Françoise, de Evolène, à Sion, associée et présidente des gérants, avec signature individuelle, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Ballestaz, Mélina, de Grône, à Lens, associée et présidente des gérants, avec signature individuelle, pour 180 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00];
Coppex, Guillaume, de Vouvry, à Ardon, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Publication number: HR02-1004986510, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Flonima SA, à Sion, CHE-312.338.938, société anonyme (No. FOSC 164 du 25.08.2017, Publ. 3715945).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Flonima SA en liquidation. La société est dissoute par décision de l'assemblée générale du 06.07.2020.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Macharis, Jean Paul, ressortissant belge, à Destelbergen (BE), directeur, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Anzévui, Françoise, de Evolène, à Sion, administratrice unique, liquidatrice, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: administratrice unique, avec signature individuelle].
Publication number: HR02-1004981831, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
AF-Conseils Sàrl, à Sion, CHE-112.322.273, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 81 du 27.04.2018, Publ. 4199711).
Modification des statuts:
06.07.2020.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Anzévui, Françoise, de Evolène, à Sion, associée et présidente des gérants, avec signature individuelle, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle, pour une part sociale de CHF 19'000.00 et pour une part sociale de CHF 1'000.00];
Ballestaz, Mélina, de Grône, à Lens, associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.