Michael Altorfer
domiciled in Winterthur, from Volketswil Active mandates: Brainfield AG Connected persons: Ramon Fabio Gut, Thierry Roland Pascal Geffroy You can stay up to date through "Michael Altorfer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Michael Altorfer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Michael Altorfer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Michael Altorfer"
|
Places where people with the name Michael Altorfer live
Sectors in which people with the name Michael Altorfer work
Temp agency services
Temp agency services
Private persons with the name Michael Altorfer
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Michael Altorfer
Publication number: HR02-1006019667, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Brainfield AG, in Zürich, CHE-498.632.852, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 22.12.2023, Publ. 1005917941).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Altorfer, Michael, von Volketswil, in Winterthur, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004451975, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Swiss Biotech Association (SBA), in Zürich, CHE-112.741.115, Verein (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 22.06.2017, Publ. 3595589).
Statutenänderung:
03.05.2018. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Tissot, Jean-Marc, von Orny, in Saint-Prex, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Camblong, Jurgi, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bernex, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bamert, Sabine, von Tuggen, in Meilen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Altorfer, Michael, von Zürich, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4209519, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 81 vom 27.04.2018, publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 3208 vom 24.04.2018 Canlion AG, in Emmen, CHE-254.871.362, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 81 vom 27.04.2018, Publ. 4198437).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Altorfer, Michael Martin, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [nicht: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].