Pierre Aeby
domiciled in Bussy FR, from Düdingen Active mandates: Aeby Pierre Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Pierre Aeby", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Pierre Aeby"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Pierre Aeby", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Pierre Aeby"
|
|
Pierre Aeby
domiciled in Veyrier, from Giffers Active mandates: Veyri Caves Pierre Aeby Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Pierre Aeby", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Pierre Aeby"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Pierre Aeby", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Pierre Aeby"
|
Places where people with the name Pierre Aeby live
Sectors in which people with the name Pierre Aeby work
Notary and advocate office
BranchCode_n/a
Notary and advocate office
BranchCode_n/a
Private persons with the name Pierre Aeby
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Pierre Aeby
Publication number: 3108213, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pro Senectute - Für das Alter, in Zürich, CHE-105.827.378, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 50 vom 11.03.2016, Publ. 2719357).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aeby, Pierre, von Düdingen, in Estavayer-le-Lac, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Preiswerk, Mathis, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Tuor, Dr. Rudolf, von Breil/Brigels und Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
BDO AG (CHE-105.952.747), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Biedermann, Thomas, von Winterthur, in Thunstetten, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Dietschi, Peter, von Laupersdorf, in Meggen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Wehrli, Laurent, von Montreux, in Montreux, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
KPMG AG (CHE-106.084.881), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 5656248, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Kardex AG, in Zürich, CH-020.3.914.448-5, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 07.07.2009, S. 51, Publ. 5118726).
Statutenänderung:
27.04.2010. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aeby, Pierre Alain, von Giffers, in Regensdorf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Niekerke, Friedrich Dirk, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 5545468, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Kardex Systems AG, in Volketswil, CH-020.3.914.593-1, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 30 vom 12.02.2010, S. 28, Publ. 5491594).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aeby, Pierre Alain, von Giffers, in Steinmaur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Facchini, Felice, von Aarau, in Aarau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.