Reports for Stiftung zsge
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung zsge
- Stiftung zsge is active in the industry «Other social services» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Zürich.
- The organization was founded on 29.11.1975 and has 10 persons in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 30.05.2024.
- Stiftung zsge is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-101.352.956.
Management (10)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Eva Schwendimann,
Michael Olivier Reimann,
Kristina Lena Wagner,
Alexander Theine,
Barbara Winter-Werner
newest authorized signatories
Michael Olivier Reimann,
Kristina Lena Wagner,
Theodor Eugster,
Edgar Martin Rutishauser
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.11.1975
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.905.292-7
UID/VAT
CHE-101.352.956
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung hat zum Zweck, Personen, die in einem Strafverfahren stehen oder verurteilt wurden, durch Beratung und Begleitung, durch Gewähren von Obdach und finanzieller Unterstützung sowie in anderer Weise beizustehen. Insbesondere will die Stiftung beitragen, dass nach der Entlassung von inhaftierten Personen aus dem Vollzug deren Wiedereingliederung in die Gesellschaft gefördert wird, dass in der Öffentlichkeit eine aufgeschlossene Einstellung zu den Verurteilten Platz greift und dass die Familien von inhaftierten Personen Rat und tätige Hilfe erhalten. Sie kann im Übrigen geeignete Massnahmen zur Verhütung von Straffälligkeit fördern. Der Stiftungsrat kann den Stiftungszweck und die Mittel zu dessen Erreichung in einem Reglement näher umschreiben.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ryser Treuhand AG | Zürich | 28.03.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TCM Treuhand GmbH | Niederglatt | 29.05.2008 | 27.03.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Zürcher Stiftung für Gefangenen- und Entlassenenfürsorge
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
Lerski | 21.02.2008 | active | 61129/2007 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung zsge
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006043432, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung zsge, in Zürich, CHE-101.352.956, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 122 vom 27.06.2023, Publ. 1005778690).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Straub, Esther, von Egnach, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schwendimann, Eva, von Stocken-Höfen, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005778690, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung zsge, in Zürich, CHE-101.352.956, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 105 vom 02.06.2023, Publ. 1005758810).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aisslinger, Peter, von Zürich, in Zürich, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wagner, Kristina Lena, von Basel, in Zürich, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Reimann, Michael Olivier, von Zürich, in Wallisellen, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Eugster, Theodor, genannt Theo, von Altstätten, in Hittnau, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Theine, Alexander, von Köniz, in Brugg, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005758810, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 36 vom 22.02.2021 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 7557 vom 17.02.2021 Stiftung zsge, in Zürich, CHE-101.352.956, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2022, Publ. 1005634002). Kristina Wagner wurde irrtümlich mit dem im SHAB Nr. 36 vom 22.02.2021 publizierten TR-Eintrag 7557 vom 17.02.2021 neu eingetragen anstatt mutiert. Deshalb erfolgt nachstehende Mutation.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wagner, Kristina, von Basel, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wagner, Kristina Lena, von Basel, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.