Branches (1)
Reports for Zaunteam Heidiland GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Zaunteam Heidiland GmbH
- Zaunteam Heidiland GmbH has its legal headquarters in Bad Ragaz and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Other construction».
- Zaunteam Heidiland GmbH was founded on 26.05.2014.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 01.12.2022.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SG under the UID CHE-244.916.253.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.05.2014
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Bad Ragaz
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.4.075.732-1
UID/VAT
CHE-244.916.253
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist das Erstellen von Zäunen, der Gartenbau, die Verrichtung von Umgebungsarbeiten sowie der Handel mit Waren aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben, verkaufen und belasten sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, welche geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- ForstLog SüdOst GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Zaunteam Heidiland GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005617322, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Zaunteam Heidiland GmbH, in Pfäfers, CHE-244.916.253, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 195 vom 07.10.2022, Publ. 1005578349).
Statutenänderung:
22.11.2022.
Sitz neu:
Bad Ragaz.
Domizil neu:
Industriestrasse 80, 7310 Bad Ragaz.
Zweck neu:
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist das Erstellen von Zäunen, der Gartenbau, die Verrichtung von Umgebungsarbeiten sowie der Handel mit Waren aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben, verkaufen und belasten sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, welche geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Publication number: HR02-1005578349, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Zaunteam Heidiland GmbH, in Pfäfers, CHE-244.916.253, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 57 vom 23.03.2020, Publ. 1004858261).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hobi, Niklaus Alfons, von Pfäfers, in Valens (Pfäfers), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Trabold, Helga, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Vilters (Vilters-Wangs), mit Einzelprokura.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Werner Schneider AG (CHE-108.017.513), in Landquart, Gesellschafterin, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Schneider, Matthias Robert, von Pfäfers, in Vilters (Vilters-Wangs), Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schneider, Claudio Athanasius, von Pfäfers, in Pfäfers, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004858261, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Zaunteam Heidiland GmbH, in Pfäfers, CHE-244.916.253, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 25.05.2018, S.0, Publ. 4249357).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ritter, Ernst Franz Arnold, von Mels, in Heiligkreuz (Mels), Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hobi, Niklaus Alfons, von Pfäfers, in Valens (Pfäfers), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit 15 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Trabold, Helga, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Vilters (Vilters-Wangs), mit Einzelprokura.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.