Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Z Medien-Verlags AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.05.1992
Deletion from the commercial register
07.05.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wil (SG)
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-300.3.013.244-0
UID/VAT
CHE-107.404.385
Sector
Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führung eines Verlags für die Herausgabe von Presse-Erzeugnissen, Handel mit EDV-Hardware sowie Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im EDV-Bereich. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben, halten und veräussern, Zweigunternehmen im In- und Ausland errichten sowie sich an anderen Unternehmungen irgendwelcher Art beteiligen.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Copartner Revision AG | Basel | 10.10.2017 | 06.05.2018 | |
consis Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Wil (SG) | 02.12.2014 | 09.10.2017 | |
Treuhandbüro Daniel Bosshardt | Häggenschwil | <2004 | 01.12.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Amriswiler Verlags AG - AV
- Amriswiler Verlags AG ¬ AV
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Z Medien-Verlags AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4215265, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Z Medien-Verlags AG, in Wil SG, CHE-107.404.385, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 196 vom 10.10.2017, Publ. 3800549). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die Swiss Regiomedia AG, in Baar (CHE- 161.721.017), über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 3800549, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Z Medien-Verlags AG, in Wil SG, CHE-107.404.385, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 02.12.2014, Publ. 1854527).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zehnder, Andreas Georges, von Birmenstorf AG, in Wil SG, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Zehnder, Rolf Peter, von Birmenstorf AG, in Herisau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Zehnder-Ritacco, Jacqueline, von Diepflingen, in Wil SG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
consis Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-109.619.838), in Wil SG, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baltisser, Martin, von Weiach, in Bremgarten bei Bern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bollmann, Rolf, von Weisslingen, in Seuzach, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Somm, Markus, von Erlen, in Wädenswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Copartner Revision AG (CHE-107.423.224), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 1854527, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Z Medien-Verlags AG, in Wil SG, CHE-107.404.385, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 112 vom 12.06.2008, S. 12, Publ. 4520030).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dr. Rietmann & Partner AG, Wirtschaftsprüfer und Steuerberater, in St. Gallen (CH-320.3.015.621-5), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
consis Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-109.619.838), in Wil SG, Revisionsstelle.