Reports for York Consumer Health Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout York Consumer Health Sàrl
- York Consumer Health Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Hauteville, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of general healthcare facilities».
- The management of the company York Consumer Health Sàrl consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 03.01.2013.
- The last commercial register change was made on 02.06.2021. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of FR under the UID CHE-446.799.781.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.01.2013
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Hauteville
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.551.868-2
UID/VAT
CHE-446.799.781
Sector
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toutes activités de conseils et de prestations de services en matière de nutrition et de santé et la vente de produts y relatifs (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- York Consumer Health Ltd. Liab. Co
- York Consumer Health Sagl
- York Consumer Health GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: York Consumer Health Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005202941, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
York Consumer Health Sàrl, à Hauteville, CHE-446.799.781 (FOSC du 11.08.2017, p. 0/3692589).
Personne radiée:
Clayton Emma Rachel, gérante, signature individuelle.
Personnes inscrites modifiées:
Clayton Michael John, associé, 100 parts de CHF 100, gérant, président, signature individuelle, maintenant à Hauteville;
Clayton Diane Elizabeth, associée, 100 parts de CHF 100, gérante, signature individuelle, maintenant à Hauteville.
Publication number: 3692589, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
York Consumer Health Sàrl, à Riaz, CHE-446.799.781 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225826). Siège transféré à Hauteville.
Nouvelle adresse:
Route du Charmin 15, 1648 Hauteville. Statuts modifiés le 30.06.2017.
Personnes inscrites modifiés:
Clayton Michael John, associé gérant président, signature individuelle, maintenant à Pleasanton (US);
Clayton Diane Elizabeth, associée gérante, signature individuelle, maintenant à Pleasanton (US).
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Clayton Emma Rachel, de Hauteville, à Lausanne, gérante, signature individuelle.
Publication number: 7004296, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
York Consumer Health Sàrl [York Consumer Health GmbH] [York Consumer Health Sagl] [York Consumer Health Ltd. Liab. Co], à Riaz, Impasse des Terreaux 4, 1632 Riaz, CH-217-3551868-2. Nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée. Statuts du 21.12.2012.
But:
toutes activités de conseils et de prestations de services en matière de nutrition et de santé et la vente de produts y relatifs (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
selon statuts.
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.--.
Associés:
Clayton Michael John, de et à Hauteville, avec 100 parts de CHF 100.--, et Clayton Diane Elizabeth, de et à Hauteville, avec 100 parts de CHF 100.--.
Gérants:
les associés Clayton Michael John, gérant président, et Clayton Diane Elizabeth, gérante, tous deux avec signature individuelle.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communication aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel. Selon déclaration du 21.12.2012, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.