Reports for Wohngruppen Sennwald
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Wohngruppen Sennwald
- Wohngruppen Sennwald has its legal headquarters in Sennwald and is active. It is an Association and active in the industry «Operation of other homes (excluding holiday homes)».
- The management consists of 9 persons. The organization was founded on 04.01.2022.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 12.12.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization's UID is CHE-105.347.701.
Management (9)
newest members of the committee
Felix Schmid,
Gabriela Helga Ammann-Pridgar,
Petra Hermann Hutter,
André Fernandez,
Hermann Thoma
newest authorized signatories
Felix Schmid,
Petra Hermann Hutter,
Laila Roduner,
Alexandra Büchel-Gassner
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.01.2022
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Sennwald
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.6.092.983-4
UID/VAT
CHE-105.347.701
Sector
Operation of other homes (excluding holiday homes)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Verein betreibt Wohngruppen zur kurz- und mittelfristigen Betreuung von Kindern und Jugendlichen in Krisensituationen sowie zur langfristigen Anschlussbetreuung nach der Bewältigung von Krisensituationen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Wohngruppen Sennwald
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005907958, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Wohngruppen Sennwald, in Sennwald, CHE-105.347.701, Verein (SHAB Nr. 20 vom 28.01.2022, Publ. 1005392253).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ammann, Thomas, von Oberriet (SG), in Rüthi (Rheintal) (Rüthi (SG)), Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmid, Felix, von Willisau, in Grabs, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Ammann, Gabriela, von Oberriet (SG), in Rüthi (Rheintal) (Rüthi (SG)), Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005392253, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 5 vom 07.01.2022 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 103 vom 04.01.2022 Wohngruppen Sennwald, in Sennwald, CHE-425.107.691, Verein (SHAB Nr. 5 vom 07.01.2022, Publ. 1005376046).
UID neu:
CHE-105.347.701 [bisher: CHE-425.107.691].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hermann Hutter, Petra, von Oberriet (SG), in Lüchingen (Oberegg), Vizepräsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Lüchingen (Altstätten)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.