Address
c/o St. Jakobskellerei Schuler & Cie AG Schwyz
Franzosenstrasse 14
6423 Seewen SZ
Reports for Wohlfahrtsfonds der Schuler-Unternehmungen
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Wohlfahrtsfonds der Schuler-Unternehmungen
- Wohlfahrtsfonds der Schuler-Unternehmungen from Seewen SZ operates in the sector «Operation of an pension fund» and is active.
- The organization was founded on 21.08.1982.
- On the 03.04.2024 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization Wohlfahrtsfonds der Schuler-Unternehmungen is registered under the UID CHE-104.046.094.
- SCHULER Areal AG, Schuler Weingüter-Beteiligungen AG, Schuler-Beteiligungen AG are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.08.1982
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Schwyz
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.0.000.746-9
UID/VAT
CHE-104.046.094
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung der Wohlfahrt und insbesondere die Vorsorge für die Arbeitnehmer der Stifterfirmen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
CONVISA Revisions AG | Schwyz | 02.03.2011 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
CONVISA AG | Schwyz | 18.02.2009 | 01.03.2011 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Wohlfahrtsfonds der Schuler-Unternehmungen
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: LS05-0000003604, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz
Rubrik: Liquidationsschuldenrufe Unterrubrik: Liquidationsschuldenruf einer Stiftung Publikationsdatum: SHAB 03.04.2024 Öffentlich einsehbar bis: 03.04.2029 Meldungsnummer: Publizierende Stelle CONVISA AG, Herrengasse 14, 6430 Schwyz Liquidationsschuldenruf Wohlfahrtsfonds der Schuler-Unternehmungen Organisation in Aufhebung: Wohlfahrtsfonds der Schuler-Unternehmungen CHE-104.046.094 c/o: bei St. Jakobskellerei Schu-, ler & Cie AG Schwyz Franzosenstrasse 14
Kontaktstelle: CONVISA AG Herrengasse 14
Publication number: LS05-0000003440, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz
Rubrik: Liquidationsschuldenrufe Unterrubrik: Liquidationsschuldenruf einer Stiftung Publikationsdatum: SHAB 09.11.2023 Öffentlich einsehbar bis: 09.11.2028 Meldungsnummer: Publizierende Stelle CONVISA AG, Herrengasse 14, 6430 Schwyz Liquidationsschuldenruf Wohlfahrtsfonds der Schuler-Unternehmungen Organisation in Aufhebung: Wohlfahrtsfonds der Schuler-Unternehmungen CHE-104.046.094 c/o: bei St. Jakobskellerei Schu-, ler & Cie AG Schwyz Franzosenstrasse 14
Kontaktstelle: CONVISA AG, Herrengasse 14,
Publication number: HR02-1005499370, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Wohlfahrtsfonds der Schuler-Unternehmungen, in Schwyz, CHE-104.046.094, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 255 vom 31.12.2020, Publ. 1005062548).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wehrli, Dr. Reto, von Wäldi, in Schwyz, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schuler, Philippe, von Schwyz, in Bern, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.