Address
c/o Hefe Schweiz AG
Hauptstrasse 11
9507 Stettfurt
Reports for Wohlfahrtsfonds der Indawisa Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Wohlfahrtsfonds der Indawisa Holding AG
- Wohlfahrtsfonds der Indawisa Holding AG is active in the industry «Operation of an pension fund» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Stettfurt.
- Wohlfahrtsfonds der Indawisa Holding AG has 4 persons entered in its management.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 07.09.2022. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of TG is CHE-109.490.556.
- Companies with the same address as Wohlfahrtsfonds der Indawisa Holding AG: Hefe Schweiz AG, Myceta AG, PHF Holding AG.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Walter Friedrich Ingold,
Severin Christian Gutjahr-Preisig,
Dr. Markus Letsch
newest authorized signatories
Walter Friedrich Ingold,
Severin Christian Gutjahr-Preisig,
Dr. Markus Letsch
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.09.1985
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Stettfurt
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.902.030-2
UID/VAT
CHE-109.490.556
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vorsorge zugunsten der Arbeitnehmer der Firma "Indawisa Holding AG", in Gutenburg, sowie deren Hinterbliebenen gegen die wirtschaftlichen Folgen von Alter, Invalidität und Tod, sowie Unterstützung des Vorsorgenehmers oder seiner Hinterlassenen in Notlagen wie bei Krankheit, Unfall, Invalidität, Arbeitslosigkeit. Der Stiftung kann auch das Personal von mit der Firma wirtschaftlich oder finanziell eng verbundener Unternehmungen angeschlossen werden. Die Stiftung kann zur Finanzierung von Beiträgen und Versicherungsprämien auch Leistungen an andere steuerbefreite Personalvorsorgeeinrichtungen erbringen, die zugunsten der Destinatäre bestehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Solidis Revisions AG | Olten | 16.10.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Wohlfahrtsfonds der Indawisa Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005556865, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Wohlfahrtsfonds der Indawisa Holding AG, in Stettfurt, CHE-109.490.556, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 181 vom 19.09.2019, Publ. 1004719842).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bachmann, Peter, von Stettfurt, in Stettfurt, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ingold, Walter, von Heimenhausen, in Madiswil, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gutjahr-Preisig, Severin, von Schwellbrunn, in Amriswil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004719842, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Wohlfahrtsfonds der Indawisa Holding AG, in Stettfurt, CHE-109.490.556, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 139 vom 22.07.2015, S.0, Publ. 2283599).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Diehl, Heinz R., von Bonfol, in Meisterschwanden, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Sägesser, Hans, von Bannwil, in Willisau Land, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bachmann, Peter [keine Mutation, nur Anpassung der Funktion], von Stettfurt, in Stettfurt, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Bachmann, Peter, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Ingold, Walter, von Heimenhausen, in Madiswil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Letsch, Dr. Markus, von Dürnten, in Baar, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 2283599, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Wohlfahrtsfonds der Indawisa Holding AG, in Stettfurt, CHE-109.490.556, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 200 vom 16.10.2014, Publ. 1772483).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Solidis Revisions AG (CHE-102.352.278), in Olten, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Sudan Partner AG (CHE-102.352.278)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.