Address
c/o DeLaval AG
Münchrütistrasse 2
6210 Sursee
Reports for Wohlfahrtsfonds der DeLaval AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Wohlfahrtsfonds der DeLaval AG
- Wohlfahrtsfonds der DeLaval AG from Sursee operates in the sector «Operation of an pension fund» and is active.
- The management of the organization Wohlfahrtsfonds der DeLaval AG consists of 4 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 10.07.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-109.762.192.
- On the same address there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Admir Transporte Garaljevic, DeLaval AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.09.1964
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Sursee
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.7.004.004-1
UID/VAT
CHE-109.762.192
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vorsorge für die nachstehend bezeichneten Destinatäre gegen die wirtschaftlichen Folgen von Alter, Tod, Invalidität, Krankheit, Unfall und in besonderen Notlagen. Destinatäre sind die Arbeitnehmer der Stifterfirma, ihre Angehörigen und Hinterlassenen sowie Personen, für die der Arbeitnehmer nachweisbar bis zuletzt gesorgt hat.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Luzern | 31.07.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Wohlfahrtsfonds der DeLaval AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005790982, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Wohlfahrtsfonds der DeLaval AG, in Sursee, CHE-109.762.192, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 189 vom 29.09.2021, Publ. 1005300969).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gloor, Ursula, von Stein SG, in Leutwil, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Heyer, Matthias, von Biel-Benken, in Mauensee, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005300969, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Wohlfahrtsfonds der DeLaval AG, in Sursee, CHE-109.762.192, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 44 vom 03.03.2017, Publ. 3382295).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kirchhofer, Herbert, von Büron, in Schenkon, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Thürig, Guido, von Eich, in Rickenbach (LU), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3382295, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Wohlfahrtsfonds der DeLaval AG, in Sursee, CHE-109.762.192, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 214 vom 03.11.2011, Publ. 6401926).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bäckmann, Karl Anders Börje, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Stockholm (SE), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmid, Urs, von Neuenkirch, in Neuenkirch, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
BDO AG (CHE-384.263.558), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle [bisher: BDO AG, in Luzern (CH-100.9.010.550-2)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.