Reports for WELIGHT Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout WELIGHT Sàrl
- WELIGHT Sàrl with its legal headquarters in Nyon is a Limited liability company from the sector «Other services: entertainment and recreation». WELIGHT Sàrl is active.
- WELIGHT Sàrl has one person entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 16.11.2021.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-364.416.178.
- Altus Impact Sàrl, ArchiTECHture, atelier d'architecture Sàrl, Chez Alice - Alice Descamps have the same address as WELIGHT Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.06.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Nyon
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.174.912-0
UID/VAT
CHE-364.416.178
Sector
Other services: entertainment and recreation
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but le commerce de décorations lumineuses. Elle peut également procéder à des opérations de commercialisation, de promotion, de distribution, d'importation et d'exportation pour le compte de tiers, y compris des activités de stratégies de marketing et de lancement de marque. Elle pourra par ailleurs fournir des conseils dans ces domaines et proposer des solutions événementielles, ainsi que des services liés au commerce d'articles promotionnels, à l'agence d'artistes et à l'activité de promoteurs (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: WELIGHT Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005335318, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
WELIGHT Sàrl, à Nyon, CHE-364.416.178 (FOSC du 07.09.2018, p. 0/1004451699). Pessina-Costa Patricia, laquelle n'est plus associée-gérante et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 200 parts de CHF 100 à Rodrigues Fábio Alex, du Portugal, à Veyrier, nouvel associé-gérant avec signature individuelle, avec 200 parts de CHF 100.
Publication number: HR02-1004451699, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
WELIGHT Sàrl, à Nyon, CHE-364.416.178 (FOSC du 03.07.2017, p. 0/3618323). Obradovic Marko, lequel n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 200 parts de CHF 100 à Pessina-Costa Patricia, de Genève, à Saint-Cergue, nouvelle associée-gérante avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: 3618323, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
WELIGHT Sàrl, à Nyon, rue Perdtemps 5, 1260 Nyon, CHE-364.416.178. Nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée.
Statuts:
26 juin 2017.
But:
la société a pour but le commerce de décorations lumineuses. Elle peut également procéder à des opérations de commercialisation, de promotion, de distribution, d'importation et d'exportation pour le compte de tiers, y compris des activités de stratégies de marketing et de lancement de marque. Elle pourra par ailleurs fournir des conseils dans ces domaines et proposer des solutions événementielles, ainsi que des services liés au commerce d'articles promotionnels, à l'agence d'artistes et à l'activité de promoteurs (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts.
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.
Associé-gérant avec signature individuelle:
Obradovic Marko, de et à Nyon, avec 200 parts de CHF 100.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel. Selon déclaration du 26 juin 2017, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.