Reports for Waterproof digital media design GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Waterproof digital media design GmbH
- Waterproof digital media design GmbH has its legal headquarters in Künten and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «IT services».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 25.08.2006.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 22.05.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-113.075.781.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.08.2006
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Künten
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.4.027.937-2
UID/VAT
CHE-113.075.781
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vermietung von Rechenleistungen und Datenkapazität im Internet, Erstellen und Überarbeiten von Internetseiten, Installieren von Computern, Netzwerken und Servern, Fehlersuche bei Computern, Datensicherungen sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art; kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich bei anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften und Wertschriften erwerben, verwalten und verkaufen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Waterproof digital media design GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006037083, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Waterproof digital media design GmbH, in Künten, CHE-113.075.781, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 238 vom 08.12.2009, S.2, Publ. 5380634).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hagen, Edith, von Baden, in Künten, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 2'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hagen, Thomas, von Baden, in Künten, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 18'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 2'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 18'000.00].
Publication number: 5380634, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Waterproof digital media design GmbH, in Künten, CH-400.4.027.937-2, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 168 vom 31.08.2006, S. 1, Publ. 3528462). Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 24.06.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision..
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hagen, Thomas, von Baden, in Künten, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 18'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 3528462, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Waterproof digital media design GmbH, in Künten, CH-400.4.027.937-2, Eggenrain 16, 5444 Künten, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
22.08.2006.
Zweck:
Vermietung von Rechenleistungen und Datenkapazität im Internet, Erstellen und Überarbeiten von Internetseiten, Installieren von Computern, Netzwerken und Servern, Fehlersuche bei Computern, Datensicherungen sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art;
kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich bei anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften und Wertschriften erwerben, verwalten und verkaufen.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.--.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB.
Eingetragene Personen:
Hagen, Thomas, von Baden, in Künten, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 18'000.--;
Hagen, Edith, von Baden, in Künten, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 2'000.--.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.