Branches (1)
Reports for Voyages Jean-Louis SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Voyages Jean-Louis SA
- Voyages Jean-Louis SA is active in the industry «Travel agency and tour operator services» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Fétigny.
- The company was founded on 18.07.2017.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 09.08.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- Voyages Jean-Louis SA is registered in the Canton of FR under the UID CHE-418.580.384.
- On the same address as Voyages Jean-Louis SA there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Chardonnens Terrassement et Génie Civil SA, Mondial Voyages Sàrl.
Management (4)
newest board members
Patrick Chardonnens,
Jean-Daniel Chardonnens,
Claude Alain Chardonnens,
Maryse Defferrard
newest authorized signatories
Patrick Chardonnens,
Jean-Daniel Chardonnens,
Claude Alain Chardonnens,
Maryse Defferrard
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.07.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Fétigny
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.564.320-6
UID/VAT
CHE-418.580.384
Sector
Travel agency and tour operator services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'une entreprise d'organisation de voyages et d'excursions ainis que de transports de personnes (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduconseils SA | Estavayer | 21.07.2017 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Voyages Jean-Louis SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005812962, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Voyages Jean-Louis SA, à Fétigny, CHE-418.580.384 (FOSC du 08.04.2022, p. 0/1005446537).
Personne radiée:
Chardonnens Alexandre Olivier, administrateur, signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005446537, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Voyages Jean-Louis SA, à Fétigny, CHE-418.580.384 (FOSC du 13.07.2020, p. 0/1004935367).
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Chardonnens Maryse, administratrice, signature collective à deux, nouveau nom Defferrard Maryse.
Publication number: HR02-1004935367, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Voyages Jean-Louis SA, à Fétigny, CHE-418.580.384 (FOSC du 15.11.2019, p. 0/1004760458).
Fusion:
reprise des actifs et passifs de Chardonnens Transport SA (CHE-404.396.644), à Fétigny, selon contrat de fusion du 30.06.2020 et bilan au 31.12.2019, présentant des actifs de CHF 287'961.88 et des passifs envers les tiers de CHF 189'676.25, soit un actif net de CHF 98'285.63, contre attribution à l'actionnaire de la société transférante de 100 actions de CHF 1'000. Capital-actions augmenté de CHF 100'000 par suite de fusion.
Nouveau capital-actions:
CHF 200'000, libéré à concurrence de CHF 198'000, divisé en 200 actions de CHF 1'000, nominatives et liées selon statuts (jusqu'ici CHF 100'000, entièrement libéré, divisé en 100 actions de CHF 1'000, nominatives et liées selon statuts). Statuts modifiés le 30.06.2020.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.