Address
c/o De Zanet AG
Wilenstrasse 1
8722 Kaltbrunn
Reports for Vorsorgestiftung Destra
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Vorsorgestiftung Destra
- Vorsorgestiftung Destra with its legal headquarters in Kaltbrunn is active. Vorsorgestiftung Destra operates in the sector «Operation of an pension fund».
- The management of the organization Vorsorgestiftung Destra consists of 6 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 23.04.2024.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SG under the UID CHE-109.718.481.
- Companies with an identical address: De Zanet AG, Destra Holding AG, Gewerbezentrum Wilen AG.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
newest authorized signatories
Rena De Zanet,
Tobias Gmür,
Franco De Zanet,
Ingeborg De Zanet-Tessmer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.03.1985
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Kaltbrunn
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.7.024.568-8
UID/VAT
CHE-109.718.481
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Berufliche Vorsorge für die Arbeitnehmer der Stifterfirma und mit dieser wirtschaftlich oder finanziell eng verbundener Unternehmungen sowie für deren Angehörige und Hinterlassene gegen die wirtschaftlichen Folgen von Alter, Tod und Invalidität.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Consultive Revisions AG | Gossau (SG) | 21.12.2012 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revisal AG Gossau | Gossau (SG) | 22.12.2010 | 20.12.2012 | |
BDO AG | St. Gallen | 04.12.2008 | 21.12.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Vorsorgestiftung Destra
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006015676, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Vorsorgestiftung Destra, in Kaltbrunn, CHE-109.718.481, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 221 vom 14.11.2019, Publ. 1004759490).
Domizil neu:
c/o De Zanet AG, Wilenstrasse 1, 8722 Kaltbrunn.
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Ostschweizer BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht (CHE-113.698.580), in St. Gallen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
De Zanet, Romano, von Kaltbrunn, in Kaltbrunn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
De Zanet, Rena, von Kaltbrunn, in Wädenswil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004759490, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Vorsorgestiftung Destra, in Kaltbrunn, CHE-109.718.481, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 24.12.2013, S.0, Publ. 1257863).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gmür, Bruno, von Amden, in Kaltbrunn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gmür, Tobias, von Amden, in Amden, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Bytyqi, Arsim, kosovarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Kaltbrunn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Consultive Revisions AG (CHE-177.439.093), in Gossau SG, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Consultive Revisions AG].
Publication number: 1257863, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Vorsorgestiftung Destra, in Kaltbrunn, CHE-109.718.481, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 21.12.2012, Publ. 6988910).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sterchi, Thomas, von Lützelflüh, in Maseltrangen (Schänis), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gmür, Tobias, von Amden, in Amden, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.