Reports for vonZürichfürZürich AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout vonZürichfürZürich AG
- vonZürichfürZürich AG in Zürich is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of sales stands and public markets». vonZürichfürZürich AG is active.
- The company was founded on 02.08.2018 and has 2 persons in its management.
- On the 25.03.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-350.385.985.
- There are 13 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Aline Gerber, Fotografin, Beach Company AG, Beachalp AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.08.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.046.339-0
UID/VAT
CHE-350.385.985
Sector
Operation of sales stands and public markets
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Organisation und den Betrieb von Weihnachtsmärkten und anderen Verkaufsveranstaltungen sowie den Handel von Produkten aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann mobile Verkaufs- und Gastronomieflächen vermieten und betreiben und alle Sach-, Beratungs- und übrigen Dienstleistungen erbringen sowie alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Gesellschaftszweck im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Liegenschaften erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Trescor Treuhand Kt. Schwyz AG | Unteriberg | 07.08.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: vonZürichfürZürich AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005993134, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
vonZürichfürZürich AG, in Zürich, CHE-350.385.985, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 150 vom 07.08.2018, Publ. 4400185).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schindler, Urs, von Meggen, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 4400185, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
vonZürichfürZürich AG, in Zürich, CHE-350.385.985, Eibenstrasse 9, 8045 Zürich, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
25.07.2018.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Organisation und den Betrieb von Weihnachtsmärkten und anderen Verkaufsveranstaltungen sowie den Handel von Produkten aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann mobile Verkaufs- und Gastronomieflächen vermieten und betreiben und alle Sach-, Beratungs- und übrigen Dienstleistungen erbringen sowie alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Gesellschaftszweck im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Liegenschaften erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 300'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 300'000.00.
Aktien:
3'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen:
Zimmerli, Andreas, von Unterentfelden, in Einsiedeln, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Knup, Peter, von Zürich, in Zürich, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schindler, Urs, von Meggen, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Trescor Treuhand Kt. Schwyz AG (CHE-107.629.429), in Unteriberg, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.