Reports for VILLENOUVELLE Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout VILLENOUVELLE Sàrl
- VILLENOUVELLE Sàrl from Morges operates in the sector «Connecting properties to local public utilities/infrastructure» and is active.
- The company was founded on 19.06.2017 and has 6 persons in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 30.01.2024.
- VILLENOUVELLE Sàrl is registered in the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-307.593.436.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.06.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Morges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.174.558-2
UID/VAT
CHE-307.593.436
Sector
Connecting properties to local public utilities/infrastructure
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but toute activité dans le domaine de la construction et de l'immobilier, en particulier la conception, la promotion, la réalisation et la gestion de projets immobiliers; l'achat, la vente et la mise en valeur de biens immobiliers, à l'exception des opérations prohibées par la LFAIE (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: VILLENOUVELLE Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005947966, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
VILLENOUVELLE Sàrl, à Nyon, CHE-307.593.436 (FOSC du 22.06.2017, p. 0/3596869). Espace Holding Sàrl (CHE-446.655.828), Forum Holding Sàrl (CHE-212.409.006) et Jaguar Développement SA (CHE-301.233.235), qui ne sont plus associées, cèdent respectivement leurs 50 parts de CHF 100, 50 parts de CHF 100 et 100 parts de CHF 100 à FRANCOIS VAULTIER MANAGEMENT Sàrl (CHE-195.106.620), à Morges, nouvelle associée, titulaire de 200 parts de CHF 100. Statuts modifiés le 19.01.2024. Siège transféré à Morges.
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue des Vignerons 1a, 1110 Morges. Wahlen Pierre et Mangeat Vincent ne sont plus gérants;
leur signature est radiée. Vaultier François, maintenant à Echichens, signe désormais individuellement. Kohn Pierre et Tahier Jean-Marie continuent à signer collectivement à deux, désormais toutefois pas entre eux.
Publication number: 3596869, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
VILLENOUVELLE Sàrl, à Nyon, place du Château 7, c/o Mangeat Wahlen Architectes Associés Sàrl, 1260 Nyon, CHE-307.593.436. Nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée.
Statuts:
29 mai 2017.
But:
la société a pour but toute activité dans le domaine de la construction et de l'immobilier, en particulier la conception, la promotion, la réalisation et la gestion de projets immobiliers;
l'achat, la vente et la mise en valeur de biens immobiliers, à l'exception des opérations prohibées par la LFAIE (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts.
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.
Associées:
Espace Holding Sàrl (CHE-446.655.828), Forum Holding Sàrl (CHE-212.409.006), toutes deux à Nyon, chacune avec 50 parts de CHF 100, et Jaguar Développement SA (CHE-301.233.235), à Morges, avec 100 parts de CHF 100. Signature collective à deux, toutefois pas entre eux, est conférée à Wahlen Pierre, de Rubigen, à Nyon, gérant président, et Mangeat Vincent, de Fontenais, à Tannay, gérant, et signature collective à deux, toutefois pas entre eux, est conférée à Vaultier François, de France, à Morges, gérant, Tahier Jean-Marie et Kohn Pierre, tous deux de France, à Lausanne, directeurs.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel. Selon déclaration du 29 mai 2017, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.