Reports for Vidoli Nautic Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Vidoli Nautic Sàrl
- Vidoli Nautic Sàrl from Crans VD operates in the sector «Other transportation services» and is active.
- The management consists of 5 persons. The company was founded on 16.12.2003.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 19.07.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company Vidoli Nautic Sàrl is registered under the UID CHE-110.352.085.
Management (5)
Executive board
Romain Cazenave,
Pierre-Yves Jorand,
Tomás García González,
Frédéric Yves Boder
newest authorized signatories
Romain Cazenave,
Pierre-Yves Jorand,
Tomás García González,
Frédéric Yves Boder
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.12.2003
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Crans (VD)
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.037.282-1
UID/VAT
CHE-110.352.085
Sector
Other transportation services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Commerce et services relatifs au nautisme.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidugère partenaires SA | Echallens | 19.07.2024 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Vidoli Nautic Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006089667, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Vidoli Nautic Sàrl, à Crans (VD), CHE-110.352.085 (FOSC du 27.11.2023, p. 0/1005894702). Radiation de la mention relative à la renonciation à l'organe de révision.
Organe de révision:
Fidugère partenaires SA (CHE-108.761.416), à Echallens.
Publication number: HR02-1005894702, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Vidoli Nautic Sàrl, à Crans (VD), CHE-110.352.085 (FOSC du 20.10.2023, p. 0/1005865982).
Nouveau gérant:
Cazenave Romain, de France, à Genève, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005865982, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Vidoli Nautic Sàrl, à Crans (VD), CHE-110.352.085 (FOSC du 12.06.2023, p. 0/1005766699). Gilliéron Pascal n'est plus gérant;
sa signature est radiée.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.