Reports for Verein Schweizer Skischule Fiesch
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Verein Schweizer Skischule Fiesch
- Verein Schweizer Skischule Fiesch with its legal headquarters in Fiesch is an Association from the sector «Other services in education». Verein Schweizer Skischule Fiesch is active.
- Verein Schweizer Skischule Fiesch has 5 persons entered in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 19.09.2022.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Verein Schweizer Skischule Fiesch is the following: CHE-104.023.319.
Management (5)
newest members of the committee
Ivan Volken,
David Volken,
Christian Wellig,
Johann Bortis,
Alois Burgener
newest authorized signatories
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.10.1981
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Fiesch
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.6.002.035-1
UID/VAT
CHE-104.023.319
Sector
Other services in education
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Schweizer Skischule Fiesch bezweckt das Ski- und Schneesportlehrerwesen in ihrem Tätigkeitsgebiet zu organisieren und die Entweicklung des Schneesports im Bereich des Möglichen zu fördern. In ihren Aufgabenkreis fallen insbesondere: Der Betrieb der Schweizer Skischule Fiesch; die Erteilung von Unterricht durch Schneesportlehrer/innen; die Abnahme von Schneesportprüfungen; der Betrieb von Einrichtungen zur Förderung und Verbesserung des Schneesport Lehrbetriebes; die Sicherung der für den Schneesportunterricht erforderlichen Kinderübungsgelände; die zielbewusste Mitarbeit bei der allgemeinen Förderung des Schneesportberufes im Interesse des Fremdenverkehrs; Organisation von Trainings- und Ausbildungskursen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Schweizer Schneesportschule Fiesch
- Schweizer Ski- und Snowboardschule Fiesch
- Schweizerische Skischule Fiesch
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Verein Schweizer Skischule Fiesch
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005564531, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Verein Schweizer Skischule Fiesch, in Fiesch, CHE-104.023.319, Verein (SHAB Nr. 177 vom 13.09.2021, Publ. 1005290293).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Perren, Urs, von Lax, in Lax, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Volken, Ivan, von Fiesch, in Fieschertal, Mitglied des Vorstandes + Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005290293, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Verein Schweizer Skischule Fiesch, in Fiesch, CHE-104.023.319, Verein (SHAB Nr. 52 vom 15.03.2019, Publ. 1004589092).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Perren, Urs, von Lax, in Lax, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Volken, Ivan, von Fiesch, in Fieschertal, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004589092, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Verein Schweizer Skischule Fiesch, in Fiesch, CHE-104.023.319, Verein (SHAB Nr. 222 vom 15.11.2017, Publ. 3871523).
Statutenänderung:
10.12.2018. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wellig, Christian, von Fiesch, in Fiesch, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied und Sekretär, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Volken, David, von Fieschertal, in Fieschertal, Mitglied und Sekretär des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Bortis, Johann, genannt Hans, von Fiesch, in Fiesch, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.