Reports for Vendôme finances Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Vendôme finances Sàrl
- Vendôme finances Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Courtepin, is active and operates in the sector «Services for banks and credit institutions».
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 06.07.2011.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 09.09.2015.
- Vendôme finances Sàrl is registered in the Canton of FR under the UID CHE-169.643.214.
- The address is identical with 4 other active companies. These include: AXA-Winterthur - Agence principale - Michel Jacquat, Fiduciaire Cifag SA, MC équestrian, Barbosa Da Costa.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.07.2011
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Courtepin
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.547.882-4
UID/VAT
CHE-169.643.214
Sector
Services for banks and credit institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Conseil en financement hypothécaire et immobilier, courtage hypothécaire et dans les domaines de l'assurance et finance, acquisition de contrats d'assurances dans toutes les branches ainsi que toutes activités liées au développement de la société (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Gaultherie Sàrl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Vendôme finances Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2364183, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Gaultherie Sàrl, à Courtepin, CHE-169.643.214 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225826).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Vendôme finances Sàrl.
Nouvelle adresse:
Route de la Colline 6, 1784 Courtepin.
Nouveau but:
conseil en financement hypothécaire et immobilier, courtage hypothécaire et dans les domaines de l'assurance et finance, acquisition de contrats d'assurances dans toutes les branches ainsi que toutes activités liées au développement de la société (cf. statuts pour but complet). Statuts modifiés le 01.09.2015. Gauthier Isabelle n'est plus associée suite à la cession de ses 20 parts de CHF 1'000 respectivement 10 parts à Jacquat Michel, directeur, maintenant associé avec 10 parts de CHF 1'000, et respectivement 10 parts à Jacquat Micheline, d'Avry, à Courgevaux. Gauthier Isabelle n'est plus gérante, sa signature est radiée. Jacquat Michel est nommé gérant et président, Jacquat Micheline est nommée gérante, tous deux avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: 6247422, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Gaultherie Sàrl, à Courtepin, Route de la Colline 6, c/o Fiduciaire Cifag SA, 1784 Courtepin, CH-217-3547882-4. Nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée. Statuts du 29.06.2011.
But:
exploitation d'un cabinet traitant les domaines de la naturopathie, psychothérapie et magnétisme ainsi que l'organisation de conférences, publication et communication. (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.--.
Prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
selon statuts.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communication aux associés:
par écrit ou par courrier électronique.
Associée:
Gauthier Isabelle, de France, à Fontenay (F), avec 20 parts de CHF 1'000.--.
Gérante:
l'associée Gauthier Isabelle avec signature individuelle. Jacquat Michel, d'Avry, à Courgevaux, est nommé directeur avec signature individuelle. Selon déclaration du 29.06.2011, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.