Reports for VELDANA MEDICAL SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout VELDANA MEDICAL SA
- VELDANA MEDICAL SA with its legal headquarters in Morges is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Leasing of intangible assets». VELDANA MEDICAL SA is active.
- VELDANA MEDICAL SA was founded on 23.12.1985.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 16.10.2015. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-100.834.075.
Management (4)
newest board members
Manuel Barro Robles,
Philippe Perrin,
Hector David Garcia Fernandez
newest authorized signatories
Manuel Barro Robles,
Gian Luca Lettieri,
Philippe Perrin,
Hector David Garcia Fernandez
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.12.1985
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Morges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.138.840-3
UID/VAT
CHE-100.834.075
Sector
Leasing of intangible assets
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Développer, promouvoir et commercialiser des droits, produits, procédés et dispositifs nouveaux pour l'industrie, notamment des biens d'équipement et de consommation, en particulier dans le domaine médical. Détenir tous droits y compris sous forme de licences, relatifs à des brevets, demandes de brevets, procédés, dispositifs et savoir-faire en relation avec toutes inventions.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG SA | Lausanne | 30.04.2013 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FICOGERE fiduciaire conseils gérances SA | Jorat-Mézières | 18.06.2010 | 10.03.2013 | |
BDO SA | Epalinges | <2004 | 17.06.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Pnn Medical SA
- WALLSTEN MEDICAL SA
- Packard Development SA
- Wallsten Medical SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: VELDANA MEDICAL SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2430181, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
VELDANA MEDICAL SA, à Morges, CHE-100.834.075 (FOSC du 05.06.2015, p. 0/2190499). Daout David n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Nouvel administrateur avec signature collective à deux:
Barro Robles Manuel, d'Espagne, à Madrid (Espagne).
Publication number: 2190499, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
VELDANA MEDICAL SA, à Morges, CHE-100.834.075 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Signature individuelle est conférée à Lettieri Gian Luca, d'Italie, à Neuchâtel, directeur général.
Publication number: 984821, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Pnn Medical SA, à Morges, CH-550-0138840-3 (FOSC du 30.04.2013, p. 0/7170534). Statuts modifiés le 2 juillet 2013.
Nouvelle raison de commerce:
VELDANA MEDICAL SA.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.