Address
c/o Rémi Duchemin
Chemin de Crételles 28
3975 Randogne
Reports for UTMB International Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout UTMB International Sàrl
- UTMB International Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Randogne and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Sport services».
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 23.02.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VS is CHE-420.347.408.
Management (4)
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Catherine Causse Poletti,
Rémi Duchemin,
Michel Pierre Poletti
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.03.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Crans-Montana
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.4.017.772-8
UID/VAT
CHE-420.347.408
Sector
Sport services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'exploitation commerciale de la marque UTMB à l'échelle internationale à travers l'organisation d'événements sportifs en direct, la vente de licences, la vente de franchises et de tous autres produits ou prestations ou services y relatifs (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA | Martigny | 23.02.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: UTMB International Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005686259, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
UTMB International Sàrl, à Crans-Montana, CHE-420.347.408, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 110 du 10.06.2020, Publ. 1004907615).
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Rémi Duchemin, Chemin de Crételles 28, 3975 Randogne. [biffé: Selon déclaration du 15.02.2017, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.].
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA (CHE-105.760.685), à Martigny, organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1004907615, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
UTMB International Sàrl, à Crans-Montana, CHE-420.347.408, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 97 du 20.05.2020, Publ. 1004894087).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Duchemin, Rémi, ressortissant français, à Crans-Montana, directeur, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: à Lens].
Publication number: HR02-1004894087, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
UTMB International Sàrl, à Crans-Montana, CHE-420.347.408, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 57 du 22.03.2017, p.0, Publ. 3419339).
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Laurent Gillioz, Route du Bouillet 2, 3971 Chermignon.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
OC Sport Suisse Sàrl (CHE-114.718.469), à Crans-Montana, associée, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
UTMB Group, société par actions simplifiée de droit français, à Chamonix-Mont-Blanc (FR), associée, pour 200 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: AUTOUR DU MONT BLANC, société à responsabilité limitée de droit français, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00];
Causse épouse Poletti, Catherine, ressortissante française, à Chamonix-Mont-Blanc (FR), présidente des gérants, avec signature individuelle, [précédemment: directrice, avec signature individuelle];
Poletti, Michel, ressortissant français, à Chamonix-Mont-Blanc (FR), gérant, avec signature individuelle, [précédemment: directeur, avec signature individuelle];
Duchemin, Rémi, ressortissant français, à Lens, directeur, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: Duchemin , Rémi, gérant, avec signature individuelle, ].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.