Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Urs Marty Treuhand AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.06.1995
Deletion from the commercial register
24.07.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Uster
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.006.274-5
UID/VAT
CHE-108.334.758
Sector
Fiduciary services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb einer Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern, ferner Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 09.12.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Urs Marty Treuhand AG
- Marty Urs Treuhand AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Urs Marty Treuhand AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4377403, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Urs Marty Treuhand AG in Liquidation, in Uster, CHE-108.334.758, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 88 vom 08.05.2017, Publ. 3508881). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 3508881, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Urs Marty Treuhand AG, in Uster, CHE-108.334.758, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 174 vom 08.09.2011, Publ. 6327758).
Firma neu:
Urs Marty Treuhand AG in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 26.04.2017 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kläy, Dr. Hanspeter, von Rüegsau, in Köniz, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Ghilardelli, Franco, von Härkingen, in Oberdorf SO, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 6327758, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Urs Marty Treuhand AG, in Uster, CH-020.3.006.274-5, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 80 vom 26.04.2011, S. 0, Publ. 6135152).
Domizil neu:
Oberlandstrasse 105, 8610 Uster.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meier, Heinz, von Maur und Schleitheim, in Uster, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kläy, Dr. Hanspeter, von Rüegsau, in Köniz, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ghilardelli, Franco, von Härkingen, in Oberdorf SO, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Auckenthaler, Jörg Andreas, von Zürich und Pully, in Beckenried, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hanselmann, Urs, von Rapperswil-Jona und Sennwald, in Uster, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wyss, Andreas, von Dietikon und Fulenbach, in Dietikon, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ziegler, Thomas, von Derendingen, in Rüschlikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.