Reports for Untersee immo+consult GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Untersee immo+consult GmbH
- Untersee immo+consult GmbH is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Kriens.
- Untersee immo+consult GmbH was founded on 12.09.2014.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 30.11.2023.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of LU is CHE-190.512.467.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.09.2014
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Kriens
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.4.798.761-1
UID/VAT
CHE-190.512.467
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Halten, Bewirtschaftung, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Immobilien und Renditeobjekten; Beratungen, Dienstleistungen und Handel in den Bereichen Fahrzeug-, Transport-, Tourismus- und Gastrobranche wie auch weiteren technischen Branchen; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Belastung, Veräusserung und Verwaltung von Grundeigentum; Vornahme von Finanzierungen sowie Eingehung von Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Untersee immo+consult S.a.g.l.
- Untersee immo+consult Ltd liab. Co
- Untersee immo+consult S.à.r.l.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Untersee immo+consult GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005897503, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Untersee immo+consult GmbH, in Kriens, CHE-190.512.467, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 101 vom 26.05.2023, Publ. 1005754625).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Untersee, René Alfred, von Waldkirch, in Kriens, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Untersee, Cornel, von Waldkirch, in Kriens, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, ohne Stammanteil];
Otter-Untersee, Caroline, von Waldkirch, in Kriens, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, ohne Stammanteil].
Publication number: HR02-1005754625, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Untersee immo+consult GmbH, in Kriens, CHE-190.512.467, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 83 vom 01.05.2018, Publ. 4203909).
Domizil neu:
Bergstrasse 50B, 6010 Kriens.
Publication number: 4203909, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Untersee immo+consult GmbH, in Kriens, CHE-190.512.467, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 179 vom 17.09.2014, Publ. 1718723).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Untersee-Stocker, Rosmarie, von Luzern, in Kriens, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Untersee, René Alfred, von Waldkirch, in Kriens, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 18 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Otter-Untersee, Caroline, von Waldkirch, in Kriens, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Untersee, Cornel, von Waldkirch, in Kriens, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.