Reports for UMI ASIA AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout UMI ASIA AG
- UMI ASIA AG with its legal headquarters in Aarburg is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Trading with various goods». UMI ASIA AG is active.
- There are 7 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 17.07.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company UMI ASIA AG is the following: CHE-482.037.483.
- Companies with the same address as UMI ASIA AG: MC2 Institute GmbH, Thinkingschool Switzerland AG.
Management (7)
newest board members
Yixiang Chen,
Prof. Dr. Andreas Hinz,
Stefan Philippi,
Prof. Dr. Rolf-Dieter Bernd Reineke,
Markus Josef Thinnes
newest authorized signatories
Yixiang Chen,
Prof. Dr. Andreas Hinz,
Stefan Philippi,
Prof. Dr. Rolf-Dieter Bernd Reineke,
Markus Josef Thinnes
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.04.2012
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aarburg
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.037.756-4
UID/VAT
CHE-482.037.483
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel, Produktion, Service und Reparaturen von Industriegütern weltweit; Export, Service und Reparaturen von Schweizer- und anderen Industriegütern weltweit; Beratungen im Bereich von Import- und Exportgeschäften; Technische und ingenieurmässige Beratungen im Bereich von Industriegütern; Forschung und Entwicklung im Bereich von Industriegütern; Die Gesellschaft kann Kommissionsgeschäfte im Bereich von Industriegütern tätigen; Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften mieten und vermieten, erwerben und verkaufen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche im Zusammenhang mit Liegenschaften vorkommen, insbesondere auch Liegenschaften verwalten; Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, im In- und Ausland andere Unternehmen erwerben, errichten oder veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- UMI ASIA Ltd
- UMI ASIA SA
- UMI ASIA Ltd.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: UMI ASIA AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006087075, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
UMI ASIA AG, in Aarburg, CHE-482.037.483, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 18.12.2023, Publ. 1005912907).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Chen, Yixiang, singapurischer Staatsangehöriger, in Ho Chi Minh City (VN), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005912907, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
UMI ASIA AG, in Aarburg, CHE-482.037.483, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 252 vom 27.12.2021, Publ. 1005368869).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Loretz, Beat, von Vals, in Sigriswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Reineke, Prof. Dr. Rolf-Dieter, von Aarburg, in Aarburg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: deutscher Staatsangehöriger, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Hinz, Prof. Dr. Andreas, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Philippi, Stefan, von Ingenbohl, in Münchenstein, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005368030, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
UMI ASIA AG, in Pfäffikon, CHE-482.037.483, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 160 vom 21.08.2019, Publ. 1004699395). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Aarburg im Handelsregister des Kantons Aargau eingetragen und im Handelsregisteramt des Kantons Zürich von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.