Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Address
c/o Dorothea Marguerite Ulrich
Gsteigstrasse 1
8703 Erlenbach ZH
Reports for Ulrich Medizinische Präventionsberatung GmbH in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.06.2004
Deletion from the commercial register
10.01.2022
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Erlenbach (ZH)
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.029.101-6
UID/VAT
CHE-111.711.100
Sector
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist die Erbringung von Beratungen und das Anbieten von Tests im präventivmedizinischen Bereich, insbesondere in Bezug auf Ernährung, Bewegung und Stressmanagement. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Massnahmen treffen und alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens und die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszweckes zu fördern oder zu erleichtern. Sie kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder errichten, sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten oder veräussern.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Ulrich Medizinische Präventionsberatung GmbH
- Furler Medizinische Präventionsberatung GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ulrich Medizinische Präventionsberatung GmbH in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1005376809, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Ulrich Medizinische Präventionsberatung GmbH in Liquidation, in Erlenbach (ZH), CHE-111.711.100, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 8 vom 14.01.2020, Publ. 1004803544). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1004803544, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Ulrich Medizinische Präventionsberatung GmbH, in Erlenbach (ZH), CHE-111.711.100, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 01.07.2019, Publ. 1004663293).
Firma neu:
Ulrich Medizinische Präventionsberatung GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 19.11.2019 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Graf, Rolf, von Wolfhalden, in Zürich, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ulrich, Dorothea, von Küsnacht (ZH), in Erlenbach (ZH), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00 [bisher: mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00];
Fischer, Ingrid, von Winterthur, in Stäfa, Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004663293, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Ulrich Medizinische Präventionsberatung GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-111.711.100, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 59 vom 24.03.2016, S.0, Publ. 2742253).
Statutenänderung:
21.06.2019.
Sitz neu:
Erlenbach (ZH).
Domizil neu:
c/o Dorothea Marguerite Ulrich, Gsteigstrasse 1, 8703 Erlenbach ZH.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ulrich, Dorothea, von Küsnacht (ZH), in Erlenbach (ZH), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00 [bisher: in Herrliberg].