Reports for Ulrich Huber AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ulrich Huber AG
- Ulrich Huber AG with its legal headquarters in Malans GR is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Other construction». Ulrich Huber AG is active.
- The management of the company Ulrich Huber AG, which was founded on the 05.02.1979, consists of 4 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 04.06.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register GR under the UID CHE-107.949.897.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.02.1979
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Malans
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.003.343-4
UID/VAT
CHE-107.949.897
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Projektierung und Ausführung von Sanitär- und Heizungsinstallationen sowie Handel mit entsprechenden Apparaturen und Zubehör; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
treuhand marugg + imsand ag | Zug | 30.07.2014 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Montana AG Treuhand und Revision | Chur | <2004 | 29.07.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Huber Ulrich AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ulrich Huber AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006047616, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Ulrich Huber AG, in Malans, CHE-107.949.897, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 74 vom 18.04.2023, Publ. 1005726436).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Arnold, Christoph, von Unterschächen, in Beamsville (CA), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rutz, Barbara, von Niederlenz, in Embrach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Weiss, Andreas, von Aeugst am Albis, in Mettmenstetten, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Böhm, Zeno, von Risch, in Risch, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005726436, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Ulrich Huber AG, in Malans, CHE-107.949.897, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 95 vom 17.05.2022, Publ. 1005475621).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rutz, Barbara, von Niederlenz, in Embrach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005475621, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Ulrich Huber AG, in Malans, CHE-107.949.897, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 80 vom 26.04.2022, Publ. 1005458595).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brüesch, Diego, von Tschiertschen-Praden, in Feusisberg, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Syfrig, Thomas, von Horw, in Richterswil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.