Reports for Trocknungsgenossenschaft Birchi-Säriswil
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Trocknungsgenossenschaft Birchi-Säriswil
- Trocknungsgenossenschaft Birchi-Säriswil with its legal headquarters in Säriswil is active. Trocknungsgenossenschaft Birchi-Säriswil operates in the sector «Agricultural services».
- The management has 7 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 14.08.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-105.785.550.
Management (7)
newest members of the administration
Adrian Maurer,
Daniel Etter,
Thomas Brunner,
Susan Bach,
Hans Hofmann
newest authorized signatories
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.12.1951
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Wohlen bei Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.5.017.178-2
UID/VAT
CHE-105.785.550
Sector
Agricultural services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung der Futterproduktion, insbesondere Erzeugung eines hochwertigen Trockengrases, Trocknung von Getreide und anderer landwirtschaftlicher Produkte usw.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Trocknungsgenossenschaft Birchi-Säriswil
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006106144, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Trocknungsgenossenschaft Birchi-Säriswil, in Wohlen bei Bern, CHE-105.785.550, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 15 vom 23.01.2024, Publ. 1005941177).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hutmacher, Christian, von Konolfingen, in Wohlen b. Bern (Wohlen bei Bern), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Maurer, Adrian, von Vechigen, in Ortschwaben (Meikirch), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005941177, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Trocknungsgenossenschaft Birchi-Säriswil, in Wohlen bei Bern, CHE-105.785.550, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 115 vom 16.06.2022, Publ. 1005496910).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Messerli, Jürg, von Kaufdorf, in Detligen (Wohlen bei Bern), Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Sekretär oder dem Kassier der Verwaltung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Etter, Daniel, von Meikirch, in Meikirch, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten der Verwaltung oder dem Sekretär oder dem Kassier der Verwaltung [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Bach, Susan, von Saanen, in Aarberg, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Uettligen (Wohlen bei Bern)];
Brunner, Thomas, von Seedorf (BE), in Frieswil (Seedorf (BE)), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005496910, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Trocknungsgenossenschaft Birchi-Säriswil, in Wohlen bei Bern, CHE-105.785.550, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 198 vom 12.10.2020, Publ. 1004997435).
Domizil neu:
Staatsstrasse 34, 3049 Säriswil.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Flückiger, Lorenz, von Rüegsau, in Lyssach, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bach, Susan, von Saanen, in Uettligen (Wohlen bei Bern), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.