Branches (1)
Reports for Trivadis AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Trivadis AG
- Trivadis AG with its legal headquarters in Glattbrugg is active. Trivadis AG operates in the sector «IT services».
- The company was founded on 04.11.2002 and has 9 persons in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 05.07.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- In the commercial register the company Trivadis AG is registered under the UID CHE-109.898.584.
- AIG Europe S.A., Luxemburg, Zweigniederlassung Opfikon, Emirates, Dubai, Glattbrugg Branch, Kaderversicherung der SAirGroup have the same address as Trivadis AG.
Management (9)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Cora Czuk,
Martin André Wunderli,
Sebastian Frederic Bloch,
Andrea Groth,
Anna Pollinger-Mitchell
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.11.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Opfikon
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.023.883-7
UID/VAT
CHE-109.898.584
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist die Erbringung von IT-Dienstleistungen jeglicher Art, IT-Beratung und -schulung, Datenbankberatung und -schulung, Projektentwicklungen sowie IT-Betrieb und -Wartung. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten. Die Gesellschaft kann Dritten, einschliesslich Gesellschaften, an denen sie direkt oder indirekt beteiligt ist, sowie direkten oder indirekten Aktionären der Gesellschaft oder Gesellschaften, an denen diese direkten oder indirekten Aktionäre der Gesellschaft direkt oder indirekt beteiligt sind, Darlehen oder andere Finanzierungen gewähren, mit solchen Dritten Cash-Pooling-Verträge abschliessen und für deren Verbindlichkeiten Sicherheiten aller Art bestellen und Garantien abgeben, in jedem Fall ob gegen Entgelt oder nicht und auch wenn diese Rechtsgeschäfte im ausschliesslichen Interesse der Dritten liegen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundstücke und Beteiligungen erwerben, verwalten, belasten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann jede weitere Tätigkeit ausüben, welche mit den erwähnten Zwecken direkt oder indirekt zusammenhängt.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 25.08.2022 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Aarau | 06.01.2012 | 24.08.2022 | |
Mahrer Treuhand AG | Möhlin | 17.04.2009 | 05.01.2012 | |
Mythen Treuhand- und Verwaltungs AG Zürich | Zürich | <2004 | 16.04.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Trivadis Partner AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Trivadis AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006076603, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Trivadis AG, in Opfikon, CHE-109.898.584, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 222 vom 15.11.2023, Publ. 1005885049).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Campos Gesto, Ana Maria, von Olsberg, in Islisberg, Direktorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005885049, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Trivadis AG, in Opfikon, CHE-109.898.584, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 19.04.2023, Publ. 1005726992).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Klump, Gerald Niels, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Villigen, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Duay, Dominique, von Orsières, in La Verrerie, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005726992, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Trivadis AG, in Opfikon, CHE-109.898.584, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 66 vom 04.04.2023, Publ. 1005716303).
Zweigniederlassung neu:
[gestrichen: Basel (CHE-232.141.545)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.