Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Triplan Gebäudetechnik AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.03.2009
Deletion from the commercial register
09.04.2020
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Reinach (BL)
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.014.142-6
UID/VAT
CHE-114.796.765
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Erbringen von Beratungs- und Planungsleistungen für die Energie- und Gebäudetechnik, die Prozessindustrie sowie generell für Wohnungsbau, Gewerbebau, Industrie und Dienstleistungsunternehmungen. Sie kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Immaterialgüterrechte und Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Accurata Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Zürich | 03.04.2009 | 08.04.2020 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Triplan Gebäudetechnik AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1004869324, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Triplan Gebäudetechnik AG, in Reinach (BL), CHE-114.796.765, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 229 vom 26.11.2019, Publ. 1004768235). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die "RMB Engineering AG Basel " (CHE-104.060.220 ), in Basel, über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1004768235, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Triplan Gebäudetechnik AG, in Reinach (BL), CHE-114.796.765, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 21 vom 31.01.2017, Publ. 3316421).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Loosli, André, von Sumiswald und Reinach BL, in Reinach BL, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Marzetti, Marcel, von Binningen, in Muttenz, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
à Porta, Georg, von Scuol, in Tegerfelden, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Marti, Andreas, von Grossaffoltern, in Wädenswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zardin, Pierre, von Basel, in Obersiggenthal, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Rexhaj, Albatrim, kosovarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Ehrendingen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Seiler, Xander Georg, von Dietikon, in Kerns, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
von Ah, Roger, von Sarnen, in Luzern, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3316421, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Triplan Gebäudetechnik AG, in Reinach (BL), CHE-114.796.765, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 169 vom 03.09.2013, Publ. 1057197).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Nüssle, Benjamin Christoph, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Heitersheim (DE), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Accurata Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-105.942.097), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Accurata Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CH-270.3.002.466-8)];
Marzetti, Marcel, von Binningen, in Muttenz, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.