Reports for Tourismusverein Engelberg (TUV)
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Tourismusverein Engelberg (TUV)
- Tourismusverein Engelberg (TUV) has its legal headquarters in Engelberg and is active. It operates in the sector «Travel agency and tour operator services».
- The management of the organization Tourismusverein Engelberg (TUV) consists of 4 persons. The foundation of the organization took place on 06.07.1904.
- The last commercial register change was made on 01.07.2019. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Tourismusverein Engelberg (TUV) is the following: CHE-103.283.697.
- Next to the organization Tourismusverein Engelberg (TUV) there are 8 other active companies with an identical address. These include: ACE Administration Services GmbH, Engelberg-Titlis Tourismus AG, Engelberg-Titlis Veranstaltungs GmbH.
Management (4)
newest members of the committee
Alexandre Denis Höchli-Delèze,
Martin Alexander Mahler,
Martha Bächler,
Thomas Dittrich
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.07.1904
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Engelberg
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-140.6.000.971-1
UID/VAT
CHE-103.283.697
Sector
Travel agency and tour operator services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung des Fremdenverkehrs in Engelberg.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Tourismusverein Engelberg TUV
- Kur- und Verkehrsverein Engelberg.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Tourismusverein Engelberg (TUV)
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004663573, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Tourismusverein Engelberg (TUV), in Engelberg, CHE-103.283.697, Verein (SHAB Nr. 193 vom 07.10.2014, S.0, Publ. 1754677).
Statutenänderung:
20.09.2018. [gestrichen: Vorstand: 3 - 5 Mitglieder]. Nicht publikationspflichtige weitere Statutenänderungen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Höchli, Alexandre, von Engelberg und Klingnau, in Engelberg, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 1754677, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Tourismusverein Engelberg (TUV), in Engelberg, CHE-103.283.697, Verein (SHAB Nr. 3 vom 05.01.2011, S. 6, Publ. 5972022).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mahler, Martin Alexander, von Kriens, in Engelberg, Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 5972022, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Tourismusverein Engelberg (TUV), in Engelberg, CH-140.6.000.971-1, Verein (SHAB Nr. 232 vom 29.11.2007, S. 9, Publ. 4222434).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
von Holzen, Ernst, von Ennetbürgen, in Engelberg, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bächler, Martha, von Rechthalten und St. Ursen, in Engelberg, Präsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Dittrich, Thomas, von Luzern, in Kriens, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.