Branches (1)
Reports for Thomas Müller Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Thomas Müller Immobilien AG
- Thomas Müller Immobilien AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in St. Gallen. Thomas Müller Immobilien AG belongs to the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 06.06.2002.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 07.06.2021.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SG under the UID CHE-109.604.417.
- There are 6 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Allotec AG, Audio Excellence SG GmbH, Frei AG St. Gallen.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.06.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.051.695-0
UID/VAT
CHE-109.604.417
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Übernahme von Treuhandgeschäften, Handel mit Mobilien und Immobilien und deren Verwaltung, Handel mit Konsum- und Investitionsgütern. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten und weitere Gesellschaften gründen, sich in beliebiger Form bei anderen Gesellschaften beteiligen und andere bei sich beteiligen lassen oder mit anderen Gesellschaften fusionieren sowie Generalunternehmungen führen und verwalten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Kellenberger + Partner Treuhand AG | Flawil | 20.06.2016 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Vitras Treuhand AG | St. Gallen | <2004 | 19.06.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Thomas Müller Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005208834, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Thomas Müller Immobilien AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-109.604.417, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 117 vom 20.06.2016, S.0, Publ. 2899849).
Aktien neu:
400 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 400 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00]. Die Inhaberaktien sind am 1. Mai 2021 von Gesetzes wegen in Namenaktien umgewandelt worden. Die Statuten der Gesellschaft sind noch nicht an die Umwandlung angepasst worden;
die Anpassung muss anlässlich der nächsten Statutenänderung erfolgen.
Publication number: 2899849, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Thomas Müller Immobilien AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-109.604.417, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 02.11.2015, Publ. 2457309).
Domizil neu:
Kolumbanstrasse 67, 9008 St. Gallen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vitras Treuhand AG, in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kellenberger + Partner Treuhand AG (CHE-103.050.259), in Flawil, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 2457309, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Thomas Müller Immobilien AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-109.604.417, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 20.04.2010, S. 13, Publ. 5594002).
Domizil neu:
Schönbüelpark 5, 9016 St. Gallen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müller, Thomas, von Unterkulm, in Uttwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Niederteufen (Teufen AR)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.