Reports for Theytaz Excursions SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Theytaz Excursions SA
- Theytaz Excursions SA has its legal headquarters in Hérémence and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Transportation of passenger and freight by road».
- The company was founded on 20.02.2004 and has 4 persons in its management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 15.01.2021. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- Theytaz Excursions SA is registered in the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-110.540.238.
- Companies with an identical address: Fondation Cyrille Theytaz, GONEVA V., Theytaz Bazar SA.
Management (4)
newest board members
Sébastien Lipawsky,
Serge Theytaz,
Béatrice Theytaz,
Thérèse Lipawsky
newest authorized signatories
Sébastien Lipawsky,
Serge Theytaz,
Béatrice Theytaz,
Thérèse Lipawsky
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.02.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hérémence
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.009.193-6
UID/VAT
CHE-110.540.238
Sector
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'une compagnie de transports en tout genre; l'exploitation d'un garage, du téléphérique Dixence/Lac des Dix et de ses dépendances; création ou participation à des entreprises similaires; toutes opérations commerciales, financières, industrielles et immobilières convergentes.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
NOFIVAL SA | Martigny | <2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Theytaz Excursions SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005075525, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Theytaz Excursions SA, à Hérémence, CHE-110.540.238, société anonyme (No. FOSC 204 du 20.10.2011, p.0, Publ. 6384872).
Nouvelle adresse:
Route Principale 23, 1987 Hérémence.
Autres adresses:
Avenue des Mayennets 7, 1950 Sion.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Theytaz, Jean-Jacques, de Hérémence, à Hérémence, président, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Theytaz, Serge, de Hérémence, à Sion, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur, avec signature collective à deux];
Lipawsky, Sébastien, de Düdingen, à Grimisuat, vice-président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: à Vex, directeur, avec signature individuelle].
Publication number: 6384872, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Theytaz Excursions SA, à Hérémence, CH-626.3.009.193-6, société anonyme (No. FOSC 181 du 18.09.2008, p. 16, Publ. 4656926). [biffé: bureaux : avenue des Mayennets 7, 1950 Sion].
Publication number: 4656926, Commercial Registry Office Valais
Theytaz Excursions SA, à Hérémence, CH-626.3.009.193-6, société anonyme (FOSC no 168 du 01.09.2008, p. 18, publ. 4632950).
Inscription ou modification de personne:
Lipawsky, Sébastien, de Düdingen, à Vex, directeur, avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.