Reports for Thalmann Maschinenbau AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Thalmann Maschinenbau AG
- Thalmann Maschinenbau AG with its legal headquarters in Frauenfeld is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Manufacturing of tool machinery». Thalmann Maschinenbau AG is active.
- The management of the company Thalmann Maschinenbau AG consists of 4 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 22.11.2023.
- The company Thalmann Maschinenbau AG is registered under the UID CHE-101.096.256.
Management (4)
newest board members
Reto Leibacher,
Petter Hjelmqvist,
Henrik Warlund,
Oliver Porsberg
newest authorized signatories
Reto Leibacher,
Petter Hjelmqvist,
Henrik Warlund,
Oliver Porsberg
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.02.1965
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Frauenfeld
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.004.761-5
UID/VAT
CHE-101.096.256
Sector
Manufacturing of tool machinery
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Konstruktion, Fabrikation und Vertrieb von Spezialmaschinen, Apparaten und Fabrikationseinrichtungen, sowie Tätigkeit im allgemeinen Maschinenbau. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
prime audit ag | Kreuzlingen | 19.07.2016 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
CONVISA Revisions AG | Freienbach | 30.12.2014 | 18.07.2016 | |
OBT AG | Weinfelden | <2004 | 29.12.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Thalmann Konstruktionen AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Thalmann Maschinenbau AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005891303, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Thalmann Maschinenbau AG, in Frauenfeld, CHE-101.096.256, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 59 vom 24.03.2022, Publ. 1005434857).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zech, Gerhard Friedrich, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Koblach (AT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leibacher, Reto, von Hemishofen, in Warth (Warth-Weiningen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005434857, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Thalmann Maschinenbau AG, in Frauenfeld, CHE-101.096.256, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 23.06.2021, Publ. 1005226266).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Cappello, Marco, von Frauenfeld, in Frauenfeld, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Thalmann, Martin, von Sirnach, in Felben-Wellhausen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hjelmqvist, Petter, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Lidköping (SE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Warlund, Henrik, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Lundsbrunn (SE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Zech, Gerhard Friedrich, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Koblach (AT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Porsberg, Oliver, von Urtenen-Schönbühl, in Schlatt TG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005226266, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Thalmann Maschinenbau AG, in Frauenfeld, CHE-101.096.256, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 19.07.2016, S.0, Publ. 2961701).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Cappello, Marco, von Frauenfeld, in Frauenfeld, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: italienischer Staatsangehöriger, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Thalmann, Martin [keine Mutation, Angleichung der Funktionsbezeichnung], von Sirnach, in Felben-Wellhausen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Thalmann, Martin, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.