Reports for TG Verwaltungs AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout TG Verwaltungs AG
- TG Verwaltungs AG has its legal headquarters in Giswil and is active. It operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- TG Verwaltungs AG has 3 persons entered in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 14.08.2020. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-103.868.142.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.08.1985
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Giswil
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-140.3.000.189-0
UID/VAT
CHE-103.868.142
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Veräusserung und Vermietung von Immobilien sowie ganz allgemein Verwaltung von eigenem Vermögen. Die Gesellschaft kann Beratungsdienstleistungen erbringen, Unternehmen gründen und finanzieren, Beteiligungen halten sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art betreiben. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Imfeld Consulting AG | Sarnen | 15.02.2005 | 08.02.2015 | |
Approvartis Wirtschaftsprüfungs GmbH | Sarnen | <2004 | 14.02.2005 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Toni Gasser AG
- Gasser Toni AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: TG Verwaltungs AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004957858, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
TG Verwaltungs AG, in Giswil, CHE-103.868.142, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 26 vom 09.02.2015, S.0, Publ. 1977929).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gasser, Marlis, von Lungern, in Lungern, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gasser, Michael, von Lungern, in Lungern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Gasser, Patrik, von Lungern, in Sarnen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 1977929, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
TG Verwaltungs AG, in Giswil, CHE-103.868.142, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 163 vom 24.08.2011, Publ. 6307298). Gemäss Verwaltungsratserklärung vom 27.01.2015 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Imfeld Treuhand- und Revisions AG (CH-140.3.001.068-9), in Sarnen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 6307298, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Toni Gasser AG, in Giswil, CH-140.3.000.189-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 28 vom 09.02.2007, S. 11, Publ. 3768832).
Statutenänderung:
19.08.2011.
Vermögensübertragung:
Die Gesellschaft überträgt gemäss Vertrag vom 19.08.2011 Aktiven von CHF 849'747.52 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 627'427.08 auf die TG Gasser AG, in Giswil (CH-140.3.003.954-8).
Gegenleistung:
CHF 222'320.44, welche der übernehmenden Gesellschaft als Darlehen gewährt werden.
Firma neu:
TG Verwaltungs AG.
Domizil neu:
Gorgenstrasse 3, 6074 Giswil.
Zweck neu:
Erwerb, Veräusserung und Vermietung von Immobilien sowie ganz allgemein Verwaltung von eigenem Vermögen. Die Gesellschaft kann Beratungsdienstleistungen erbringen, Unternehmen gründen und finanzieren, Beteiligungen halten sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art betreiben. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Publikationsorgan neu:
SHAB.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen. [gestrichen: Mitteilungen erfolgen - sofern Name und Adresse sämtlicher Aktionäre bekannt sind - durch eingeschriebenen Brief.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gasser, Michael, von Lungern, in Giswil, mit Einzelprokura;
Gasser, Patrick, von Lungern, in Lungern, mit Einzelprokura;
Gasser, Franziska, von Lungern, in Lungern, mit Einzelprokura.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.