Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Address
c/o ICoSS GmbH
Grundstrasse 12
6343 Rotkreuz
Reports for Tenaxis capital GmbH in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.03.2009
Deletion from the commercial register
11.10.2013
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Risch
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-130.4.014.343-2
UID/VAT
CHE-114.768.875
Sector
Fund management
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen aller Art im Finanzbereich, insbesondere Vermögensverwaltung und Anlageberatung für institutionelle Anleger und kollektive Kapitalanlagen sowie Platzierung von kollektiven Kapitalanlagen bei qualifizierten Anlegern; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, vollständig oder teilweise erwerben, halten, veräussern oder finanzieren. Mit Ausnahme von in der Schweiz gelegenen Wohnliegenschaften, kann die Gesellschaft alle Arten von Grundstücke und Liegenschaften im In- und Ausland direkt oder indirekt erwerben, halten, vermieten, belasten oder veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
DMF Treuhand Gmbh | Lachen | 19.03.2009 | 14.08.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Tenaxis capital GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Tenaxis capital GmbH in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1122999, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Tenaxis capital GmbH in Liquidation, in Risch, CH-130.4.014.343-2, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 115 vom 18.06.2013, Publ. 923185). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 923185, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Tenaxis capital GmbH in Liquidation, in Risch, CH-130.4.014.343-2, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 86 vom 06.05.2013, Publ. 7177452).
Liquidationsdomizil:
c/o ICoSS GmbH, Oberebenestrasse 43, 5620 Bremgarten AG.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
ICoSS GmbH (CH-130.4.013.531-7), in Bremgarten AG, Liquidatorin [bisher: in Risch].
Publication number: 7177452, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Tenaxis capital GmbH, in Risch, CH-130.4.014.343-2, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 157 vom 15.08.2012, Publ. 6810154).
Firma neu:
Tenaxis capital GmbH in Liquidation.
Domizil neu:
c/o ICoSS GmbH, Grundstrasse 12, 6343 Rotkreuz. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 04.04.2013 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eichinger, Gerhard, von Österreich, in Wien (AT), Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Achleitner, Adolf, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zurndorf (AT), Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 50 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Achleitner, Julia, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Zurndorf (AT), Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 8 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Massenbauer, Gerhard, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wien (AT), Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift und Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 101 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müller, Christian Timo, von Boswil, in Bremgarten AG, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift und Gesellschafter mit Einzelunterschrift und mit 21 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
ICoSS GmbH (CH-130.4.013.531-7), in Risch, Liquidatorin.