Reports for TBS Schlager AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout TBS Schlager AG
- TBS Schlager AG has its legal headquarters in Aarburg, is active and operates in the sector «Trading in consumer goods».
- The management of the company TBS Schlager AG, which was founded on the 07.12.1973, consists of 2 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 16.04.2020. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company TBS Schlager AG is the following: CHE-107.105.623.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.12.1973
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aarburg
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.002.030-7
UID/VAT
CHE-107.105.623
Sector
Trading in consumer goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Kauf, Verkauf, Vermietung und Fabrikation von sowie Handel mit Maschinen und Geräten, insbesondere für Bürobedarf und für chemotechnische und technische EDV, Verwertung von Urheberrechten und Durchführung und Vermittlung von diesbezüglichen Dienstleistungen und Beratungen; die Gesellschaft kann sämtliche Handels-, Finanz- und Industriegeschäfte tätigen, welche direkt oder indirekt damit zusammenhängen, sich an anderen Unternehmungen und Gesellschaften beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Forensis Treuhand AG | Olten | 12.02.2013 | 15.04.2020 | |
Orfida Treuhand + Revisions AG | Sarnen | <2004 | 11.02.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- TBS Schlager SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: TBS Schlager AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004872031, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
TBS Schlager AG, in Aarburg, CHE-107.105.623, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 127 vom 04.07.2019, Publ. 1004667909).
Statutenänderung:
27.02.2020.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Anteilbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 27.02.2020 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Forensis Treuhand AG (CHE-109.054.161), in Olten, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004667909, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
TBS Schlager AG, in Aarburg, CHE-107.105.623, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 117 vom 20.06.2019, Publ. 1004656062).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Niederberger, Charles, von Dallenwil, in Teufenthal (AG), Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Stans].
Publication number: HR02-1004656062, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
TBS Schlager AG, in Aarburg, CHE-107.105.623, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 132 vom 11.07.2016, Publ. 2945127).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Heinz, Jessica, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Mainz (DE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wieland, Richard, von Schüpfen, in Hägendorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Niederberger, Charles, von Stans, in Teufenthal (AG), Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.